Alaan v. Asset Acceptance LLC

Plaintiff: Arminda O. Alaan
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00328
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 41 ) Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/29/2011. (mdc)(jrd)
August 8, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part re Doc. 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/8/2011. (aef)(jrd)
October 7, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 13 ) Ex Parte Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The (Doc. 10 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice to renew the motion upon the completion of limited discovery. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/7/2010. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaan v. Asset Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arminda O. Alaan
Represented By: Clinton J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?