Del Rio v. CreditAnswers LLC

Plaintiff: Luis Del Rio
Defendant: CreditAnswers LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00346
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is no longer stayed. The (Doc. 31 ) Joint Motion to Dismiss is granted. Pursuant to the joint motion of the parties, Plaintiff's class action claims are dismissed without prejudice, and Plaintiff's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice. This action is closed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/16/2011. (mdc)(jrd)
August 26, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 25 ) Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal is granted. This action is stayed pending the resolution of CreditAnswers' appeal to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The Clerk of this Court shall administratively clos e this case. This case shall be immediately reopened without further order of this Court upon the issuance of a final order by the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit resolving CreditAnswers' appeal. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/26/2010. (mdc)
May 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Pending Action, Or in the Alternative, to Stay Federal Action Pending Resolution of Parallel State Action. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/27/10. (pdc)
April 1, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 4 ) Ex Parte Application for an Order Enjoining Defendant from Further Proceeding in 416th District Court of Collin County, Texas, Case Number 416-00625-2010, Alternatively, Motion for Temporary Stay is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/1/2010. (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio v. CreditAnswers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Del Rio
Represented By: Joshua Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CreditAnswers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?