Brighton Collectibles, Inc. v. RK Texas Leather MFG et al

Plaintiff: Brighton Collectibles, Inc.
Defendant: RK Texas Leather MFG and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00419
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2014 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 435 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; Granting 443 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Court Grants in part Brighton's motion for attorneys' fees in the amount of $275,799.05. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/2014. (srm)
May 27, 2014 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 393 Defendant AIF Corporation, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and in the Alternative, for a New Trial. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/27/2014. (srm)
September 3, 2013 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 265 Defendants' Motion For Issue Preclusion Sanctions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/3/2013. (srm)
June 11, 2013 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 232 Defendants K&L Imports, Inc., NHW, Inc., Joy MaxTrading, Inc., and YK Trading, Inc.'s Motion to Sever Claims for Trial. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/11/2013. (srm)
February 12, 2013 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying 144 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment On Trade Dress; (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 187 and 225 Defendants' Motions to Exclude Dr. Wunderlich's Expert Testimony; (3) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 163 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Frazier; and (4) Denying 184 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Lost Profits. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/2013.(srm)(jrd)
December 13, 2012 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 136 , 170 , 174 , Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Copyright Infringement, Statute of Limitations, and Laches. The parties shall promptly contact the Magistrate Judge to request a Fifth Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/13/2012. (srm) (jrl).
November 14, 2012 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 138 , 157 , 186 Motions to File Documents Under Seal; Granting 183 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Granting 198 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/14/2012. (srm)
March 6, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 106 Motion to Change Venue and Granting In Part and Denying In Part 113 Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/6/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) Modified to correct docket entry number on 3/6/2012 (cge)(jrd)
January 11, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Application to Utilize Deposition and Trial Testimony Given in Other Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/11/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brighton Collectibles, Inc. v. RK Texas Leather MFG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brighton Collectibles, Inc.
Represented By: Steven W Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Texas Leather MFG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?