Buchanan v. Gonzalez et al

Petitioner: Richard Charles Buchanan
Respondent: Fernando Gonzalez and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2010cv00423
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting 101 Report and Recommendation as Modified; (2) Denying Petition; (3) Denying 99 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing; (4) Denying 117 Motion to Expand the Record; (5) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 120 Request for Factual Findings and Judicial Notice; and (6) Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/29/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 19, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Petitioner's objections to Magistrate Judge's Pretrial Rulings. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/19/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
July 20, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 79 Motion to Amend Findings, Granting 80 leave to file addendum to first amended petition, Granting 81 Motion for leave to correct typographical errors, and Granting 83 Request for service of Mardsen hearing transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/20/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; Copies of transcript pages 319 and 328-332 of the Reporter's Transcript Volume 5-A, mailed to Petitioner)(ecs)
May 24, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Motion for Discovery; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 60 Motion for Judicial Notice; Denying 61 Motion for Sanctions; Denying 63 Motion to Compel Respondent to Comply with Order; Granting 64 Motion for Judical Notice; a nd Requiring Supplemental Lodgments. Respondent is Ordered, within 2 weeks of the date of this Order, to either Lodge the transcripts of the Marsden hearings and a complete version of Lodgment Number 12 or a declaration under penalty of perjury expl aining why it is not possible to lodge such documents. In light of the additional evidence the Court has ordered Lodged, the Petitioner'sdeadline for filing a Traverse is extended to July 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 23, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Declining to Adopt the Findings and Conclusions of United States Magistrate Judge; (2) Granting 2 Motions for Stay and Abeyance; and (3) Issuing a Stay. This action is stayed until thirty (30) days after the state supreme court rules on the petition for review now pending in that court. Respondent and Petitioner shall immediately notify this Court upon of the disposition of the petition for review. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/23/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
April 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte Substituting Respondent. The Court hereby sua sponte Orders the substitution of Matthew Cate, Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, as Respondent in place of "Fernando Gonzalez." Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/14/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Charles Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fernando Gonzalez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?