Casady et al v. American International Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Derek Casady and Nancy Casday
Defendant: American International Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Merrill Lynch International, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Cayman Islands Branch, Goldman Sachs Capital Markets, L.P., Goldman Sachs International, Societe Generale, DOES 1 through 100 and Bank Of America
Miscellaneous_party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv00431
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Defendant AIG's Motion To Dismiss, (2) Granting Counterparty Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Re Docs. 112 , 113 ): The Court grants Defendant AIG's motion to dismiss Relators' SAC (112); grants the Counterparty Defendants' motion to dismiss Relators' SAC (Doc. 113 ); and dismisses the Casadys' Second Amended Complaint in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/29/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) Modified on 3/31/2014 - Added Conclusion language to text; NEF was regenerated. (mdc)
March 20, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling re 112 , 113 Pendings Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
April 19, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant AIG'S Motion to Dismiss 59 and Denying as Moot Counterparty Defendants Motions to Dismiss 54 , 61 , 71 . If the Casadys wish, they SHALL FILE a second amended complaint within twenty-one days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date may result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casady et al v. American International Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Casady
Represented By: James J. Mahon
Represented By: Maria C Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Casday
Represented By: James J. Mahon
Represented By: Maria C Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy O Dix
Represented By: Keara M. Gordon
Represented By: Jennifer Squillario
Represented By: James D. Wareham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Zifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Laura Moranchek Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Deborah Lynn Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Cayman Islands Branch
Represented By: Deborah Lynn Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Capital Markets, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs International
Represented By: David L. Zifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale
Represented By: David C. Esseks
Represented By: Todd S. Fishman
Represented By: Kenneth M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Represented By: Laura Moranchek Hussain
Represented By: Carl J. Nichols
Represented By: Jennifer M. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous_party: United States of America
Represented By: Alan S. Gale
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Price, JR
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?