CareFusion 303, Inc. v. Sigma International

Plaintiff: CareFusion 303, Inc.
Defendant: Sigma International
Case Number: 3:2010cv00442
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on lost profit damages. Specifically, the Court grants the motion as to application of the entire market value rule and convoyed sales, and denies the motion as to any price erosion damages. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/3/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 20, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of non-infringement. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/20/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 15, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 Joint Motion to modify case schedule. New deadline for objections to pretrial disclosures 12/22/11. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/15/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 25, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Patent Claims. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/25/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CareFusion 303, Inc. v. Sigma International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CareFusion 303, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent S Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?