D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Co., Inc. v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al

Plaintiff: D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Co., Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 5 and American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00443
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant American Safety Indemnity Company (Doc. 60 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/13/2012. (mdc)
January 5, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff D.R. Horton's (Doc. 25 ) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted as to Plaintiff D.R. Horton's claims that ASIC had a duty to defend D.R. Horton under the XGI 02-1261-004 and XGI 03-1261-005 policies in the Chang O. Kim, et al. v. City of Santa Clarita, et al., Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC407614; Canyon Gate Maint. Assn v. City of Santa Clarita, et al., Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC415663; and Warrick, et al. v. City of Santa Clarita, et al., Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. PC046442 cases and related notices to builder and denied in all other respects. Defendant ASIC's (Doc. 33 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to Plaintiff D.R. Horton's third claim for declaratory relief and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/5/2012. (mdc)
September 21, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying American Safety Indemnity Company's Motion To Compel Documents (Re Doc. 23 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/21/2011. (mdc)
October 8, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: American Safety Indemnity Co.'s ( 10 Ex. 5) Request for Judicial Notice and D.R. Horton's (Doc. 15 ) Request for Judicial Notice are granted and American Safety Indemnity Co.'s (Doc. 10 ) Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim is granted in part and denied in part. American Safety Indemnity Co. is granted leave to file an amended answer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a)(2) including the counterclaim for declaratory judgment against D.R. Horton seeking to resolve American Safety Indemnity Co.'s liability to D.R. Horton only within fifteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/8/2010. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Co., Inc. v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: David S Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Scott W Sonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?