Harris v. Bueno et al

Plaintiff: Willie L Harris
Defendant: A Bueno, B Bligh and City of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2010cv00450
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Tuolumne
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule. If Mr. Bhandari wants to file a supplemental reply to Defendants' opposition, he must do so on or before December 9, 2011. If Mr. Bhandari does file a supplemental reply, Defendants may file a sur-reply on or before December 16, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/2/11.(ecs)
September 1, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/1/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer) (jrl).
April 26, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no partial filing fee, garnishing $350 balance from prisoner's trust account 2 ; (2) Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 without prejudice and (3) directing U. S. Marshal to effect service of complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/21/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR)(pro per package mailed)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Bueno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Bueno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Bligh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?