Principal Life Insurance Company v. Sadr et al

Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Kasra Sadr, Gabriel Giordano and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2010cv00510
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff Principal Life Insurance Company are Dismissed with Prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs, expenses and fees. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
October 12, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 69 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/12/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
July 1, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 12/6/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/5/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2011 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/1/10.(vet)(jrl).
June 30, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Joint Motion for Protective Order With One Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/30/10. (vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal Life Insurance Company v. Sadr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Siobhan A Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?