Zest IP Holdings, LLC et al v. Implant Direct MFG. LLC et al

Plaintiff: Zest IP Holdings, LLC and Zest Anchors, LLC
Defendant: Implant Direct MFG. LLC, Implant Direct LLC and Implant Direct INT'L
Case Number: 3:2010cv00541
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2015 572 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 566 Implant Direct Sybron International and Implant Direct Sybron Manufacturing, LLC's Motion for Certification of Orders For Interlocutory Appeal. The Court Vacates the hearing date set for this matter on January 9, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/7/2015. (srm)
December 3, 2014 568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Forth Amount of Monetary Sanctions to be Awarded to Plaintiffs. The Court awards Plaintiffs monetary sanctions in the amount of $122,486.95. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/3/2014. (srm)
November 4, 2014 558 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 456 Implant Direct Sybron International and Implant Direct Sybron Manufacturing, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Zest's Claims Based on Post-Acquisition Liability; (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 467 Zest Anchors, LLC and Zest IP Holdings LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment that IDSI is Liable for Pre- and Post-Transaction Conduct and Bound to the Court's Prior Orders and Implant Direct's Litigation Decisions; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 468 Implant Direct International, Implant Direct LLC, and Implant Direct MFG, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/04/2014. (srm)
August 14, 2014 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Striking Motions 443 , 447 , 458 ; (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 457 , 461 Motions for Leave to File Multiple Briefs in Support of Motions Noticed for the Same Hearing Date. The Court Strikes IDSI's motions for judgment on the pleadings, or in the alternative for summary judgment for failure to comply with Civil Local Rule 7.1(h). The Court Grants IDSI leave to re-file its dispositive motions and file a single, omnibus brief not to exceed sixty (60) p ages in support of all motions for judgment on the pleadings or motions for summary judgment pages by 8/18/2014. The Court Grants Implant Direct leave to file a single, omnibus brief not to exceed sixty (60) pages in support of all motions for judgment on the pleadings or motions for summary judgment by 8/18/2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/2014. (srm)
March 3, 2014 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Application to Conduct Additional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/3/2014. (srm)
January 31, 2014 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 306 Defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Renewed Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions; (2) Denying Without Prejudice Defendants' Motion to Further Amend Invalidity Contentions; (3) Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Opposition (Doc. 347 ). Implant Direct May File revised proposed amended invalidity contentions by February 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/31/2014. (srm)
January 14, 2014 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Motions to File Documents Under Seal ( 122 , 257 , 281 , 292 , 302 , 307 , 313 ); (2) Denying 326 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Without Prejudice. Defendants Granted seven (7) days to refile a renewed motion to seal the dockets lodged at Dkt. Nos. 327 and 327-1 through 327-25. The parties are directed to file public, redacted versions of all sealed documents by 2/21/2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/14/2014. (srm)
January 8, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying 282 Defendants' Motion to Clarify Answer; and (2) Denying Motion For Leave to Amend Answer. The hearing on this motion set for January 17, 2014, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/7/2014. (srm)
December 18, 2013 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 201 Motion to Strike the Joint Expert Report of Scott D. Hampton And Bruce G. Silverman Pursuant To Rule 37(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/17/2013. (srm)
November 25, 2013 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 121 Plaintiffs' Motion For Spoilation and Discovery Abuse Sanctions; Recommendation Regarding Adverse Jury Instructions. Objections to Recommendation for Adverse Inference Jury Instruction due 12/31/2013, Reply to Objections due 1/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/25/2013. (srm)
October 16, 2013 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 226 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike IDSI's Answer and Counterclaim; Granting 250 Plaintiff' Motion to Strike IDSI's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 230 Implant Direct's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Implant Direct revised proposed amended validity contentions due by October 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/16/2013. (srm)
September 13, 2013 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/13/2013.(srm)
July 17, 2013 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 216 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/2013. (srm)
April 15, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 107 , 116 Plaintiffs' Motion Join and Motion For Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions. The Court Grants Plaintiffs' motion to join IDSI and Grants Plaintiffs' motion to amend its infringement contentions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
May 16, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Markman Hearing. The Court held a Markman hearing on April 10, 2012. The Court adopts Zest's proposed construction of the swivel terms. Zest's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Niznick is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/15/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 20, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 32 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/18/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 11, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gerald Niznick. Dr. Niznick may testify on February 15, 2012, and Zest may advance any of the arguments it advances now in favor of the Court disregarding his testimony. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/10/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
November 14, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Production of Patent Applications. Plaintiff's request to compel defendants to disclose the two patent applications is granted. On or before November 23, 2011, defendants are ordered to produce unredacted copies of the entire pat ent application in Application No. '637 and Application No. '658 as reflected in Bates Stamp Nos. IDL 003314-003702, as provided to the Court in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/14/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zest IP Holdings, LLC et al v. Implant Direct MFG. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zest IP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brandon D Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zest Anchors, LLC
Represented By: Brandon D Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Implant Direct MFG. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Implant Direct LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Implant Direct INT'L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?