Haraszewski v. Brannan et al

Plaintiff: Hubert Dymitr Haraszewski
Defendant: Lisa Brannan, John Morgans, Hank Turner and Patricia Lavarmicocca
Case Number: 3:2010cv00546
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 110 as modified. Objections to the R&R are overruled. The Court grants the Motion for Summary Judgment 80 on the plaintiff's sole remaining claim. Plaintiff's reconsideration of the Court's earlier orders is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint 88 is denied. This action is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendants on all claims. The pretrial conference currently on calendar for September 9, 2013, and all other pending dates, are vacated. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/20/13.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
July 20, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Adequate Law Library Access. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/20/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
November 2, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; plaintiff may file his amended complaint no later than Thursday, November 17, 2011; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/27/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
September 30, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as Modified; Haraszewski's objections to the R&R are overruled; defendants' 29 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part; the only claims now pending before this Court a re Plaintiff's Due Process claim regarding pretrial detention; Haraszewski need not file an amended complaint, but if he chooses to do so, he must do so no later than October 21, 2011, and it may not include dismissed claims; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/30/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)(jrd)
November 16, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claims are dismissed for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b); the U.S. Marshal is directed to effect servi ce of First Amended Complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d); Defendants are ordered to reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a); Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/15/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package prepared and mailed to plaintiff)(kaj)
August 26, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 12 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 20, Order; Plaintiff is granted a thirty (30) day extension of time in which to file a First Amended Complaint that complies with the April 20, 2010 Order; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/24/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
June 28, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 9 Second Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, should he elect to file one, must be received by the Court no later than Monday, August 9, 2010; if Plaintiff chooses not to file a Amended Complaint by August 9, 2010, this action shall remain dismissed for failing to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b) and without further Order of the Court; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/25/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haraszewski v. Brannan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Dymitr Haraszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Brannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lavarmicocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?