McCabe v. Floyd Rose Guitars et al

Plaintiff: Geoffrey L. McCabe
Defendant: Floyd Rose Guitars, Floyd Rose Marketing, Inc., Floyd D. Rose, Davitt & Hanser Music Co., Ping Well Industrial Co. Ltd and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00581
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and (2) denying 98 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction over Defendant Lerner David is DENIED, and Defe ndants' motion to dismiss the sixth through eighth claims of the SAC is GRANTED. These claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If McCabe wishes, he may file an amended complaint within 14 days after this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/23/12. (lmt)
January 17, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 89 104 Motions to Seal: Plaintiff's 89 motion to file the SAC under seal is DENIED. Within fourteen days from the date this Order is electronically docketed, the parties are directed to file the redacted license agreements. If, h owever, the parties are unable to reach an agreement as to appropriate redactions, the parties are directed to file with the Court supplemental briefing not to exceed 5 pages commenting on the reasons for the inability to file redacted versions of the licensing agreements. At that time, the Court will reset this matter for a hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/17/12. (lmt)
December 5, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/5/11. (lmt)
April 12, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 37 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Re-Examination and (2) denying 59 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Court grants Defendant's Motion to Stay as to the five patent infringement claims. This action is stayed as to claims 1-5 of Plaintiff's first amended complaint. The Court denies Defendant's Motion to Stay as to claims 6-8. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/12/11. (lmt) Modified text on 4/13/2011 (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. Floyd Rose Guitars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey L. McCabe
Represented By: Trevor Quick Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Rose Guitars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Rose Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd D. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davitt & Hanser Music Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ping Well Industrial Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?