Overcast v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Wynnona Overcast
Defendant: United States of America and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00632
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute: Accordingly, upon due consideration, and given the procedural posture of this case, the Court hereby Dismisses this action Without Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case file. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/25/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 21, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. It is hereby ordered that Attorney Philip Charles Aman and Lisa J. Gary from Frantz Law Group APLC are terminated. If Shanna Overcast desires to pursue this action on behalf of minor, W.O. , within 30 days from this Order, she must retain new counsel and her counsel must file a notice of appearance with the Court. Plaintiff is advised that if her new counsel does not file a notice of appearance within the time permitted, the Court may dismiss her action without further notice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
February 1, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/1/2011. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overcast v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynnona Overcast
Represented By: Philip Charles Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?