Agricola ABC, S.A. de C.V. v. Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Agricola ABC, S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC., Chiquita Frupac, Inc, Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez and Aristeo Alejandro Canelos Guillen
Case Number: 3:2010cv00772
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED the motions to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction [Doc. No. 112, 114 and joinder motion Doc. No.118] are hereby GRANTED and the remaining motions, Doc. Nos. 106 and the non-jurisdictional portions of 114, are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff Agricolas motions: (1) a Motion to Substitute Party; and (2) a Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, [Doc. Nos. 92 and 93 respectively], are DENIED.(cge)
December 6, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Chiquita Frupac, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Answer to Add Counterclaims and Crossclaims. The Court Grants Chiquita leave to file its proposed counterclaims against Plaintiff Agricola ABC, SA de CV, and third parties Constantino Canelos Rodriguez and Aristeo Canelos vila; The Court Grants Chiquita leave to file its proposed crossclaims against Defendants Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez and Aristeo Alejandro Canelos Guilln; The Court Denies Chiquita 9;s motion for leave to amend in all other respects. The Clerk is directed to strike Chiquita's Amended Answer, filed as docket no. 41 . Chiquita shall file its Amended Answer including the above designated Counterclaims and Crossclaims within ten (10) days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/6/10. (lao)
November 19, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Quashing Service of Process. Court grants motion as to Dft Aristeo Alejandro Canelos Guillen and finds he was properly served pursuant t o FRCP 4 and CCP 415.20. Dft shall file response to the Complaint under FRCP 12 w/in 10 days of the filing of this Order. Court denies motion as to Dft Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez. Pla is granted 45 days additional days to initiate the procedure to serve Alejandro Canelos through appropriate international methods. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/19/2010. (jah)
July 28, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez and Aristeo Alejandro Canelos Guillen's 15 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service and Insufficient Service of Process. Court finds that service of process was not sufficient and alternatively quashes service of processs. Plaintiff is granted 60 days to properly effect service upon Dfts Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez and Aristeo Alejandro Canelos. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/28/2010. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agricola ABC, S.A. de C.V. v. Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agricola ABC, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Jimmy Ray Ayers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Frupac, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Canelos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristeo Alejandro Canelos Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?