Casey Gerry Schenk, Francavilla Blatt & Penfield LLP et al v. Estate of Robert Cowan et al

Plaintiff: Casey Gerry Schenk, Francavilla Blatt & Penfield LLP and Bixby, Cowan & Gerry JV
Defendant: Estate of Robert Cowan, Suzanne Dimeff and Oleta L. Cowan Trust
Case Number: 3:2010cv00821
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 74 Motion for Injunction, (2) Sua Sponte dismissing Dimeff as a party in this action, (3) granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Discharge Party, (4) requiring counsel to contact Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/13/12. (cge)
September 13, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 93 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Instruction and (2) denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration or Clarification. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/13/11. (lmt)
March 30, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying Estate's Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, To Stay; and (2) Granting In Part And Denying In Part Trust's Motion for Injunction (Doc. 42 ). The Estate of Robert Cowan shall filed proof of complia nce with this order by 4/25/2011. Suzanne Dimeff shall file responses, if any, to the complaint and crossclaims together with any counterclaims or crossclaims she intends to file in this action by 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/30/2011. (srm)
July 6, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and the Crossclaim: Suzanne Dimeff and Oleta L. Cowan Trust shall file and serve responses to the complaint and the crossclaim no later than 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/6/2010. (mjj)
May 19, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1335)a)(2): No later than June 4, 2010 Plaintiff comply with the requirements of section 1335(a)(2). If Plaintiff fails timely to comply with this order, the complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/1/2010.(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey Gerry Schenk, Francavilla Blatt & Penfield LLP et al v. Estate of Robert Cowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Gerry Schenk, Francavilla Blatt & Penfield LLP
Represented By: Richard A Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bixby, Cowan & Gerry JV
Represented By: Richard A Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Robert Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Dimeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleta L. Cowan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?