The Marine Group, LLC et al v. Marine Travelift, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
The Marine Group, LLC and National Union Fire Insurance Co. Of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania |
Defendant: |
Marine Travelift, Inc., Olson Fabrication, Inc., All-Lift Systems, Inc. and DOES |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00846 |
Filed: |
April 21, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
188
ORDER Granting 155 157 158 159 Motions for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. The settlements reached between Plaintiffs and Defendants All-Lift, Southern Weaving, JIT, and Seymour are found to be in good faith within the meaning of Ca l. Civ. Proc. Code § 877.6, and the Non-Settling Defendants are barred from pursing any claims against these Settling Defendants for equitable comparative contribution or comparative indemnity based on comparative negligence or comparative fault. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/30/2013. (rlu)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
174
ORDER Determining Discovery Dispute and Granting in part and Denying in part 169 Joint Motion Regarding Deposition of Marine Travelift, Inc. and Exactech, Inc. Expert Bradley Closson. Plaintiff's request for in excess of seven hours to depose Mr. Closson is Denied. Plaintiff may conduct a continued deposition of Mr. Closson limited to one hour and 40 minutes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/26/2012. (rlu)
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
146
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 112 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Exactech's Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/6/2012. (rlu)
|
April 6, 2012 |
Filing
140
ORDER Denying 127 Motion to Compel Discovery and (2) Granting in part and denying in part 135 Ex Parte application to continue scheduling dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/6/12. (ecs)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER re 59 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Accordingly, under the liberal pleading standards of Rule 15, the Court exercises its discretion to Grant Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint to add as defendants ExacTech, Just in Time, and Southern Weaving. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/19/11. (ecs)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
23
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 11/23/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Mandatory Settlement Conferences shall be conducted on 11/4/2010 at 02:00 PM and on 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/2/2010.(jer)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?