Poway Unified School District v. Cheng

Plaintiff: Poway Unified School District
Defendant: Katelyn Cheng
Case Number: 3:2010cv00897
Filed: April 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Docs. [54,] 64 ) Counterclaimant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Denies Counterclaimant K.C.'s motion for summary judgment on the ADA and the Unruh Civil Rights Act causes of action. The Court also Dismisses as Moot the fifth cause of action for declaratory relief and sixth cause of action for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/14/2014. (srm)
March 13, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 54 Defendant/Counterclaimant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Idea Claim and Sua Sponte Staying Case. The Court Vacates the hearing set for March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/13/2013. (srm)
September 26, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment; the ALJ's decision is vacated, and this matter is referred to him for further proceedings consistent with this Order; the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment 22 , 23 are denied without prejudice; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/23/11. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poway Unified School District v. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poway Unified School District
Represented By: Marlon C Wadlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelyn Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?