Burke v. Gonzales

Petitioner: Carl Burke
Respondent: Terri Gonzales
Case Number: 3:2010cv00927
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Second Amended Petition Without Prejudice and Without Leave to Amend; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
June 2, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing First Amended Petition Without Prejudice: If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action he must file a Second Amended Petition on or before July 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/27/10. (2nd Amended Petition mailed to Petitioner with copy of order)(pdc)
May 6, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice: If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he must submit, no later than July 2, 2010, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee, and a First Amended Petition in conformance with this Order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/5/10.(Blank 1st Amended Petition and blank IFP application sent to Petitioner with copy of Order)(pdc)(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terri Gonzales
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?