Low v. Trump University, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ed Oberkrom, Patricia Murphy, Tarla Makaeff, John Brown, Brandon Keller, Sonny Low and J.R. Everett
Defendant: Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump, DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive and Trump Entrepreneur Initiative
Case Number: 3:2010cv00940
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER Granting Joint #637 Motion to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/18. (dlg)
April 9, 2018 Filing 637 Joint MOTION to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement re #619 Judgment,, #618 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 1, 2018 Filing 636 MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to #621 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr)
June 26, 2017 Filing 635 Payment Received from Sherri B. Simpson in the amount of $ $500.00. Receipt number CAS092233 (Re #632 and #633 ) (dlg)
June 26, 2017 Filing 634 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re #633 Notice (Other) (Friedman, Gary) (dlg).
June 23, 2017 Filing 633 NOTICE OF POSTING OF APPEAL BOND by Sherri B. Simpson re #632 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re Appeal Bond)(Friedman, Gary) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg).
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #624 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg)
June 14, 2017 Filing 631 REPLY to Response to Motion re #624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
June 14, 2017 Filing 630 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Helen I. Zeldes by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg).
June 9, 2017 Filing 629 NOTICE of Change of Address by Helen Irene Zeldes (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Zeldes, Helen) (dlg).
June 8, 2017 Filing 628 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg).
June 8, 2017 Filing 627 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re #626 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Friedman, Gary) (dlg).
June 7, 2017 Filing 626 RESPONSE in Opposition re #624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, Memorandum of Law filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gary B. Friedman, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Friedman, Gary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER of USCA as to #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. The plaintiffs-appellees' unopposed motion to expedite is granted in part. This case is expedited and shall be calendared as soon as possible upon completion of briefing. Briefing schedule issued. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) regarding streamlined extensions shall not apply to this case, and any motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) is strongly disfavored and must be supported by a showing of compelling circumstances. (akr)
May 24, 2017 Filing 624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-15 to Jensen Declaration, #4 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in support thereof, #5 Declaration of Charles Marr in support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 3, 2017 Filing 623 USCA Time Schedule Order as to #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/31/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/30/2017.) (cc: Court Reporters). (Attachments: #1 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form). (akr)
May 3, 2017 Filing 622 USCA Case Number 17-55635 for #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr)
May 1, 2017 Filing 621 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to #619 Final Judgment, #618 Order, by Sherri B. Simpson. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-10035125.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Friedman, Gary). (Modified on 5/1/2017: Edited docket text re linked Judgment and Order.) (akr).
April 4, 2017 Filing 620 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/30/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 FINAL JUDGMENT. Effective as of the date of the Final Approval Order, this Judgment is binding on all Parties and all Class Members and extinguishes all Released Claims of Releasing Plaintiffs and Class Members and Releasing Defendants that were released pursuant to the Agreement. The Actions, including the individual claims of Plaintiffs and Class claims resolved in them, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice without fees or costs to any Party, except as provided in the Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017.(jao)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER (1) Granting #589 Joint Motion For Final Approval of The Proposed Class Action Settlement; and (2) Granting #590 Plaintiff's Motion For Approval of Class Representative Awards. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017. (jao)
March 30, 2017 Filing 617 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Final Approval Hearing held on 3/30/2017; Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017 re #590 - taken under submission; MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low, #589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low - taken under submission. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum and Jeffrey Stein).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin).(Gary Friedman for Objector Sherri Simpson and IIann Maazel). (no document attached) (ksr)
March 30, 2017 Filing 616 RESPONSE re #614 Declaration filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Melikian in Support Thereof)(Coughlin, Patrick) (mdc.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting re #614 Declaration. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental Documents require Court Order; No provisions for acceptance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/30/17.(dlg)
March 29, 2017 Filing 614 DECLARATION re #592 Objection, Supplemental Declaration of Sherri B. Simpson by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 23, 2017 Filing 613 NOTICE of Joinder by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #612 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
March 23, 2017 Filing 612 REPLY to Response to Motion re #590 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards , #589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support, #2 Reply Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support, #3 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support, #4 Declaration of Charles Marr, Esq. in Support, #5 Declaration of Robert Guillo)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Regina Henriquez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (Discrepancy served via U.S. Mail to filer)(dlg).
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gary B. Friedman re #606 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/10/2017.(kcm)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ilann M. Maazel re #600 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/2017.(kcm)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Andrew G. Celli, Jr. re #599 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/8/2017.(kcm)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Cheryl and E. Hunter King. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/10/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 9, 2017 Filing 606 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9884059.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Friedman, Gary)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Rhonda Feher. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form and Accompanying Documents by Michael De Cesare. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Jayakumar Patil. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Susan Pantages. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 7, 2017 Filing 600 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9875566.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maazel, Ilann)
March 7, 2017 Filing 599 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9875446.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Celli, Andrew)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Claude Henry. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/6/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2017: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 597 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re #596 Notice (Other), #592 Objection, #593 Objection, #595 Declaration, #594 Declaration (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 596 NOTICE of Intent To Appear At Final Approval Hearing by Sherri B. Simpson (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 595 DECLARATION re #592 Objection, #593 Objection Declaration of Sherri B. Simpson by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 594 DECLARATION re #592 Objection, #593 Objection Declaration of Gary B. Friedman by Objector Sherri B. Simpson. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 593 OBJECTION by Sherri B. Simpson re #589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Memorandum In Support). (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 592 OBJECTION by Sherri B. Simpson re #589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Eng, Kevin) QC email, documents should have been filed under one docket entry. Attorney is not to withdraw and refile. (dlg).
March 6, 2017 Filing 591 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Eng on behalf of Sherri B. Simpson (Eng, Kevin)Attorney Kevin Eng added to party Sherri B. Simpson(pty:obj) (dlg).
February 17, 2017 Filing 590 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 17, 2017 Filing 589 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #3 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form by Michael Snow. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Filer not a party to the case. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/14/17.(Discrepancy mailed to filer) (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2017: #1 Rejected document) (dlg).
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Settlement Claim Form by Tamasy Karoly. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Discrepancy sent via U.S. Mail to filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/1/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2017: #1 Rejected document) (dlg).
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter from Chris Umberger. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. Information pertaining to Settlement Claim Forms is set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/23/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2017: #1 Rejected Document) Discrepancy mailed to filer. (dlg).
December 29, 2016 Filing 585 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715(B) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER Granting #583 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Issuance of Notice; and Setting Final Approval Hearing. This Court shall hold a Final Approval Hearing on March 30, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. The motion for final approval and any application(s) for Service Awards shall be filed and served within sixty (60) calendar days of this Order. Any replies to any objections shall be filed and served at least seven (7) calendar days prior to the Final Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/16. (dlg)
December 19, 2016 Filing 583 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Class Action Settlement)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Objection to Settlement Letter (Ex Parte) by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Filer not a party to the case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/29/16.(discrepancy mailed to filer. dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2016: #1 Rejected document) (dlg).
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte) filed by Carol Cunningham. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance; filer not a party to the case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/28/16.(Discrepancy mailed to filer. dlg) (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
November 28, 2016 Filing 580 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 11/18/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2017. (akr)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte) from Mireille Taar. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication prohibited; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/22/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: ex parte communication ; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/21/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2016: #1 Rejected document) (dlg).
November 18, 2016 Filing 577 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing NOT held on 11/18/2016; Parties have entered into a Settlement Agreement. Ex Parte MOTION #567 to Continue Trial Date filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC,- Dismissed w/o prejudice; Ex Parte MOTION #573 For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. - Dismissed w/o prejudice. Jury Trial set for 11/28/16 - VACATED. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement due by 12/19/16. Motion Hearing to be set at a later date. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, and Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin, David Marroso). (no document attached) (ksr)
November 17, 2016 Filing 576 RESPONSE in Opposition re #573 Ex Parte MOTION For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Further Information Regarding Jury Selection filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Letter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte letter; no provision for acceptance as filer is not a party to the action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Defendants' #573 Ex Parte Application For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection: The Court directs Plaintiffs to file a response by 9:00 a.m. on November 17, 2016. No reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/16/16.(dlg)
November 16, 2016 Filing 573 Ex Parte MOTION For Further Information Regarding Jury Selection by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli In Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Petrocelli Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. #518 , #520 , #521 , #522 , #523 , #524 , #525 , #526 , #527 , #528 , #529 , #530 , #531 , #532 , #533 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/16. (dlg)
November 15, 2016 Filing 571 Minute ORDER, as to #567 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date.( Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2016 01:45 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.)(no document attached) (ksr)
November 14, 2016 Filing 570 REPLY to Response to Motion re #567 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 14, 2016 Filing 569 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motions in limine Hearing) held on 11/10/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2017. (akr). (Main Document 569 replaced on 11/15/2016 with transcript with correction to spelling of case name citation at page 17, line 8.) (akr).
November 14, 2016 Filing 568 RESPONSE in Opposition re #567 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
November 12, 2016 Filing 567 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli in Support, #2 Exhibits 1 through 5, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 10, 2016 Filing 566 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion In Limine Hearing (Oral Arguments) held on 11/10/2016; Court issued (Tentative) Ruling Doc. #565 ; Court to issue Final Order on Motions in Limine. Miscellaneous Hearing (Jury Instructions) NOT held. Court to issue (Tentative) Order on Proposed Jury Instructions. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Aaron Olsen, Brian Cochran and Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin, David Marroso and Wallace Allan). (no document attached) (ksr)
November 10, 2016 Filing 565 Notice of Tentative Ruling on Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. #518 , #520 , #521 , #522 , #523 , #524 , #525 , #526 , #527 , #528 , #529 , #530 , #531 , #532 , #533 ). Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative. The Court will entertain additional argument at the hearing on November 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/10/16.(dlg)
November 9, 2016 Filing 564 NOTICE of Appearance by Wallace Moore Allan on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Allan, Wallace)Attorney Wallace Moore Allan added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Wallace Moore Allan added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER Granting Defendants' Ex Parte #561 Application to Strike Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/8/16. (dlg)
November 8, 2016 Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by David Marroso on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Marroso, David)Attorney David Marroso added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney David Marroso added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 8, 2016 Filing 561 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #560 Request for Judicial Notice by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Kirman In Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 4, 2016 Filing 560 *** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF 563 *** REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low Request for Judicial Notice of Certain State Statutes and Regulations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: #2 Stricken Document) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 559 RESPONSE in Opposition re #520 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Unrelated to Liability During Phase 1 of Trial filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 558 RESPONSE in Opposition re #529 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 557 RESPONSE in Opposition re #525 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses, Exhibits, and Defenses filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-B, Exhibit 1-2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 556 RESPONSE in Opposition re #531 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 555 RESPONSE in Opposition re #528 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 554 RESPONSE in Opposition re #523 In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Trump University's Purported Approval Rating and Student-Victim Evaluations] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 553 RESPONSE in Opposition re #518 In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1: Ground Rules for Phase 1 of Trial filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 552 RESPONSE in Opposition re #532 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 551 RESPONSE in Opposition re #527 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 550 RESPONSE in Opposition re #526 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 549 RESPONSE in Opposition re #524 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 548 RESPONSE in Opposition re #530 In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to the Court's Class Actions Orders] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 547 RESPONSE in Opposition re #522 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1 filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 546 RESPONSE in Opposition re #521 In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3: Motion to Limit Evidence and Argument to Class Products filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
November 1, 2016 Filing 545 RESPONSE in Opposition re #533 In Limine MOTION [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4: Motion to Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission from a Different Location] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 28, 2016 Filing 544 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1-5, #2 Plaintiffs' Attachments A-C)(Jensen, Rachel) (acc).
October 28, 2016 Filing 543 NOTICE [Joint Proposed Special Verdict Forms for Phase 1 of Trial] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Jensen, Rachel) (acc).
October 25, 2016 Filing 542 AMENDED DOCUMENT, Declaration by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. Amendment to #534 Declaration / Amended Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-8). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application #536 to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman. The Court grants Defendants leave to file an amended declaration in support of their motions in limine that comports with the page limits outlined in the Courts Jury Trial Preparation and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/16. (dlg)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER Granting #519 Joint Stipulation Regarding Agreed Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/16. (dlg)
October 24, 2016 Filing 539 REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #534 Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
October 23, 2016 Filing 538 RESPONSE in Opposition re #536 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #534 Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine ] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 21, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike Omnibus Declaration by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #536 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #534 Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 21, 2016 Filing 536 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike #534 Declaration [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Strike the Omnibus Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support of Defendants Trump University's and Donald J. Trump's Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-8) (Dkt. 534), and Exhibits thereto] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit A-C to Cochran Declaration)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
October 21, 2016 Filing 535 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #534 Declaration (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 534 DECLARATION re #531 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4, #526 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3, #524 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2, #529 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5, #522 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1, #528 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7, #527 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6, #532 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 In Support by Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 6 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 6 Part 4, #10 Exhibit 6 Part 5, #11 Exhibit 7 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 7 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 7 Part 3, #14 Exhibit 7 Part 4, #15 Exhibit 7 Part 5, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 14, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Exhibit 17, #26 Exhibit 18, #27 Exhibit 19, #28 Exhibit 20, #29 Exhibit 21, #30 Exhibit 22, #31 Exhibit 23, #32 Exhibit 24, #33 Exhibit 25, #34 Exhibit 26, #35 Exhibit 27, #36 Exhibit 28, #37 Exhibit 29, #38 Exhibit 30, #39 Exhibit 31, #40 Exhibit 32, #41 Exhibit 33, #42 Exhibit 34, #43 Exhibit 35, #44 Exhibit 36, #45 Exhibit 37, #46 Exhibit 38, #47 Exhibit 39, #48 Exhibit 40, #49 Exhibit 41, #50 Exhibit 42, #51 Exhibit 43, #52 Exhibit 44, #53 Exhibit 45, #54 Exhibit 46, #55 Exhibit 47, #56 Exhibit 48, #57 Exhibit 49, #58 Exhibit 50, #59 Exhibit 51, #60 Exhibit 52, #61 Exhibit 53, #62 Exhibit 54, #63 Exhibit 55, #64 Exhibit 56, #65 Exhibit 57, #66 Exhibit 58, #67 Exhibit 59, #68 Exhibit 60, #69 Exhibit 61, #70 Exhibit 62, #71 Exhibit 63, #72 Exhibit 64, #73 Exhibit 65, #74 Exhibit 66, #75 Exhibit 67, #76 Exhibit 68, #77 Exhibit 69, #78 Exhibit 70 Part 1, #79 Exhibit 70 Part 2, #80 Exhibit 70 Part 3, #81 Exhibit 70 Part 4, #82 Exhibit 70 Part 5, #83 Exhibit 70 Part 6, #84 Exhibit 70 Part 7, #85 Exhibit 70 Part 8, #86 Exhibit 71, #87 Exhibit 72, #88 Exhibit 73, #89 Exhibit 74, #90 Exhibit 75, #91 Exhibit 76, #92 Exhibit 77, #93 Exhibit 78, #94 Exhibit 79, #95 Exhibit 80, #96 Exhibit 81, #97 Exhibit 82, #98 Exhibit 83, #99 Exhibit 84, #100 Exhibit 85, #101 Exhibit 86 Part 1, #102 Exhibit 86 Part 2, #103 Exhibit 86 Part 3, #104 Exhibit 87, #105 Exhibit 88, #106 Exhibit 89, #107 Exhibit 90, #108 Exhibit 91, #109 Exhibit 92, #110 Exhibit 93, #111 Exhibit 94, #112 Exhibit 95, #113 Exhibit 96, #114 Exhibit 97, #115 Exhibit 98, #116 Exhibit 99-101, #117 Exhibit 102, #118 Exhibit 103-109)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2016: #119 Stricken Document) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 533 In Limine MOTION [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4: Motion to Allow Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission from a Different Location] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 532 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Tu Instructors' Bankruptcy Proceedings Motion in Limine No.8 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 531 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Better Business Bureau Complaint Resolution Process, Ratings, and Membership Applications Motion in Limine No.4 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 530 In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to the Court's Class Actions Orders] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Cochran, Brian) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 529 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to: (1) New York Education Law; (2) New York State Education Department; and (3) New York Attorney General Case Motion in Limine No.5 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 528 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Gary Eldred Motion in Limine No.7 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 527 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Related to Students' Financial Condition Motion in Limine No.6 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 526 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Re: David Lazarus and LA Times Motion in Limine No.3 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 525 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses, Exhibits, and Defenses by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 524 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Certain Statements by or about Donald Trump Motion in Limine No.2 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 523 In Limine MOTION to Exclude [Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Trump University's Purported Approval Rating and Student-Victim Evaluations] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 522 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Exclude Specific Evidence of Non-Certified Alleged Misrepresentations Motion in Limine No.1 by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 521 In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3: Motion to Limit Evidence and Argument to Class Products by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 520 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Unrelated to Liability During Phase 1 of Trial by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Stein, Jeffrey) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 519 MOTION / Joint Stipulation Regarding Agreed Motion in Limine by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
October 20, 2016 Filing 518 In Limine MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1: Ground Rules for Phase 1 of Trial by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER Setting Deadline for Submission of Amended Pretrial Conference Order re 478 . A pretrial conference was held on May 6, 2016. The amended joint pretrial conference order shall be submitted via e-mail on or before October 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/12/16.(dlg)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER Denying Defendants' #514 Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Reply in Support of the Admissibility of Testimony of Former TU Student-Witness. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/19/16. (dlg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 515 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Intent to Oppose by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re #514 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the admissibility of testimony of former TU student-witnesses (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
September 19, 2016 Filing 514 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the admissibility of testimony of former TU student-witnesses by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Petrocelli in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibits A through F, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER Denying Defendats' Ex Parte #510 Application to Continue the November 28, 2016 Trial Date. The Court resets the hearing on jury instructions to November 10, 2016 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/15/16. (dlg) (jao).
September 14, 2016 Filing 512 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge, #2 Exhibit 1-6)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
September 12, 2016 Filing 511 NOTICE [Notice of Plaintiffs' Intent to Oppose Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue the November 28, 2016 Trial Date] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re #510 MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
September 12, 2016 Filing 510 MOTION to Continue / Ex Parte Application for a short continuance of the November 28, 2016 Trial Date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Petrocelli in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
September 9, 2016 Filing 509 RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low re #505 Supplemental Briefing, [Plaintiffs' Opposition to Admission of Non-Representative Student Testimony During Phase 1 of Trial]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-30 to Jensen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 31-51 to Jensen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 52-57 to the Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
September 6, 2016 Filing 508 NOTICE of Filings in Flo & Eddie, Inc. v. Sirius XM Radio, Inc., No. 13-5693 (C.D. Cal.) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #507 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
September 2, 2016 Filing 507 NOTICE of Ex Parte Application filed in Flo & Eddie, Inc. v. Sirius XM Radio Inc., No. 13-5693 (C.D.CAL) by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER Denying Defendants' #482 Motion for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification; and Denying #489 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/29/16. (dlg)
August 26, 2016 Filing 505 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #502 Scheduling Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the admissibility of former TU student-witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Kirman, #2 Exhibits 1 through 6 to Kirman Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
August 25, 2016 Filing 504 RESPONSE re #503 Objection, [Response to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order] filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) Modif (dlg).
August 24, 2016 Filing 503 OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC to Plaintiffs' Unauthorized and Improper "Proposed Order". (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the jury/bench trial for the class representatives on the issue of liability for November 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. The Court sets a hearing on motions in limine for November 10, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. All motions in limine must be filed and served on or before October 20, 2016. Written oppositions to motions in limine, if any, must be filed and served on or before November 1, 2016. No replies shall be filed. The Court sets a hearing on jury instructions for November 18, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16.(dlg)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER Granting Defendant's #485 Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg)
July 25, 2016 Filing 500 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
July 22, 2016 Filing 499 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2016, #489 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by J.R. Everett, John Brown, Sonny Low, #482 MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC ; Motions Submitted the Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Attorney Jason Forge, X. Jay Alvarez, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
July 13, 2016 Filing 498 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
July 13, 2016 Filing 497 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 re #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman). (Media Intervenor Attorney Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf)
July 8, 2016 Filing 496 REPLY to Response to Motion re #489 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
July 1, 2016 Filing 495 RESPONSE to Motion re #489 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 27, 2016 Filing 494 REPLY to Response to Motion re #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 24, 2016 Filing 493 REPLY to Response to Motion re #482 MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 22, 2016 Filing 492 RESPONSE in Opposition re #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER Regarding #487 Joint Motion for Advancement of June 30, 2016 Hearing Date. The Court reschedules the hearing date related to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order (ECF #485 ) to July 13, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16. (dlg)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #489 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders : Any response is due on or before July 1, 2016. Any reply is due on or before July 8, 2016. A hearing is set for July 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16.(dlg)
June 17, 2016 Filing 489 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to File a Motion to Clarify or Amend the Court's Class Certification Orders by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 Filing 488 RESPONSE in Opposition re #482 MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit A-G to the Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 Filing 487 Joint MOTION to Continue June 30, 2016 hearing date by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order: Any response is due on or before June 22, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 27, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/16.(dlg)
June 15, 2016 Filing 485 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amicus Curi filed by Non-party, Theodore Neubauer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental documents require court order, OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/9/16.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #482 MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification: Any response is due on or before June 17, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 24, 2016. A hearing is set for July 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/7/16.(dlg)(jao).
June 3, 2016 Filing 482 MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Decertification by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Lodged-Motion for decertification, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of David L. Kirman, #4 Exhibit 1-10 to the Kirman Declaration, #5 Exhibit 11-30 to the Kirman Declaration, #6 Exhibit 31-35 to the Kirman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 36-39 to the Kirman Declaration, #8 Declaration of Mark Covais, #9 Exhibit A-G to the Covais Declaration, #10 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
May 13, 2016 Filing 481 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 5/6/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (akr)
May 9, 2016 Filing 480 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Irene Zeldes on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Zeldes, Helen)Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
May 9, 2016 Filing 479 NOTICE of Appearance by Alreen Haeggquist on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Haeggquist, Alreen)Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
May 6, 2016 Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2016, Counsel resubmit Pretrial Order. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 11/10/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Jury Instruction/Special Verdict Hearing set for 11/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck, X. Jay Alvarez, Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
May 3, 2016 Filing 477 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Stein on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Stein, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
April 25, 2016 Filing 476 NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Jay Alvarez on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Alvarez, Xavier)Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla) (dlg).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's #443 Motion to Withdraw. Makaeff is hereby excused from her duties as a class representative in this action; The Court will invite briefing on fees and costs in connection with the motion to withdraw at an appropriate juncture; and This Court retains jurisdiction to resolve any disputes arising from Makaeff's withdrawal, Defendant Trump University's counterclaim, and Makaeff's eligibility to participate in any class recovery in this action and in Cohen. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/20/16. (ok to term plaintiff per dj chambers. dlg) (jao).
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Granting #473 Joint Motion for Extension to Complete the Deposition of Plaintiff Sonny Low. The deposition of Low shall take place on or before April 13, 2016. No other dates have changed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/7/16. (dlg) (jao).
April 6, 2016 Filing 473 Joint MOTION for Extension to Complete the Deposition of Plaintiff Sonny Low re #472 Order on Motion for Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw (ECF Nos. #443 , #466 , #470 ). The Court gives Plaintiffs notice that it intends to grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff's claims, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), ECF No. #443 , but with the conditions that (1) Defendants are entitled to depose Low again; and (2) appropriate fees and costs will be determined at a later juncture. If Plaintiffs are not amenable to the conditions imposed by the Court, Plaintiffs must withdraw their Motion within 7 calendar days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference Hearing, ECF No. #466 , is denied. Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum, ECF No. #470 , is accordingly denied as moot. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/2016. (nbp) (jao).
March 21, 2016 Filing 471 RESPONSE to Motion re #470 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason)(nbp)
March 18, 2016 Filing 470 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum and Request for Status Conference, #2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, #3 Exhibits 1-2 to Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, #4 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER #459 Granting Defendants Donald J. Trump's and Trump University's Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the First Amended Protective Order Entered March 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/17/2016. (cxl) (sjt).
March 16, 2016 Filing 466 Motion for Status Conference Hearing, SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re #443 MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] [Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum and Request for Status Conference]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-2 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) QC email sent re incorrect event. Changed event to motion and edited docket text (dlg).
March 16, 2016 Filing 465 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 3/11/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2016. (akr)
March 11, 2016 Filing 464 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2016 re #443 MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Frank Rangus). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel Jensen, Jason Forge, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Bring Documentation to March 11, 2016 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/16.(dlg)(jao).
March 3, 2016 Filing 462 REPLY to Response to Motion re #443 MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-4 to Jensen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 5 to Jensen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 6 to Jensen Declaration, #5 Exhibit 7 [Intentionally Omitted] to Jensen Declaration, #6 Exhibit 8 to Jensen Declaration, #7 Exhibit 9 to Jensen Declaration, #8 Exhibit 10-14 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 26, 2016 Filing 461 FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/17/2016.SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #459 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Main Document 461 replaced on 3/17/2016) (cxl). Modified on 3/17/2016 to add lodgment filing date (cxl).
February 26, 2016 Filing 460 FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/17/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #459 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Main Document 460 replaced on 3/17/2016) (cxl). Modified on 3/17/2016 to add lodgment filing date (cxl).
February 26, 2016 Filing 459 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
February 26, 2016 Filing 458 RESPONSE in Opposition re #443 MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, #2 Exhibits to the Declaration of David L. Kirman, #3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #454 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/22/2016. (cxl) (sjt).
February 19, 2016 Filing 455 FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/23/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #454 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl). (Main Document 455 replaced on 2/23/2016) (cxl). Modified on 2/23/2016 to add lodgment filing date(cxl).
February 19, 2016 Filing 454 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl).
February 19, 2016 Filing 453 Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Exhibit List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jensen, Rachel)(nbp)
February 19, 2016 Filing 452 Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Deposition Transcript Designations] (Jensen, Rachel) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Filing 451 Pretrial Disclosures by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff [Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) Initial Witness Lists] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Redacted], #2 Exhibit B [Redacted])(Jensen, Rachel) (nbp)
February 19, 2016 Filing 450 Pretrial Disclosures by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Application to File Under Seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered November 17, 2011 (ECF No. #444 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/10/2016. (cxl)(sjt).
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER Granting #446 Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw. Opposition Brief due by 2/26/2016, Reply Brief due by 3/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/10/2016. (srm) (jao).
February 8, 2016 Filing 446 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw (Dkt. No. 443)] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 8, 2016 Filing 445 FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT 449 ON 2/10/2016. SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #444 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl). (Main Document 445 replaced on 2/10/2016) (cxl). Modified on 2/10/2016 to add lodgment filing date(cxl).
February 8, 2016 Filing 444 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (cxl).
February 8, 2016 Filing 443 MOTION to Withdraw [Plaintiff/Counter-defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Withdraw] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof [Redacted], #2 Declaration of Tarla Makaeff in Support thereof, #3 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #4 Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration [Redacted])(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER #441 Rescheduling Pretrial Proceedings. The proposed final pretrial conference order shall be prepared, served and submitted via e-mail in Word or Word Perfect format on or before April 29, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held on May 6, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/8/16. (dlg)
February 4, 2016 Filing 441 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #434 Scheduling Order, [Joint Motion to Amend Order Scheduling Pretrial Proceedings] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
January 25, 2016 Filing 440 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Cochran on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Brandon Keller, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Cochran, Brian)Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #438 Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. Plaintiff Art Cohen's request to attend the conference telephonically is denied. Counsel for the Makaeff case is ordered to report to Judge Gallo's Chambers whether the Makaeff Named Plaintiffs will be appearing no later than Monday, January 25, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/21/16. (dlg)
January 19, 2016 Filing 438 Joint MOTION Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER Granting #436 Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump. Daniel M. Petrocelli and David L. Kirman of O'Melveny & Myers LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Trump University. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/22/15. (dlg)
December 18, 2015 Filing 436 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE RE NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC of Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy) QC email re worng event selected. Edited Docket text. Attorney to email proposed order to Chambers (dlg).
December 9, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Coughlin on behalf of John Brown, J.R. Everett, Brandon Keller, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Coughlin, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party John Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party J.R. Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Sonny Low(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (dlg).
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: Status hearing held on 12/4/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/9/2015. (srm)
December 9, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Status Hearing) held on 12/4/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2016. (akr)
December 4, 2015 Filing 432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Status Hearing held on 12/4/2015. Court will prepare scheduling order. Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/15/2016 is vacated.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, Nancy Stagg, David Kirman, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #429 Joint Motion to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines Pending December 4, 2015 Status Conference. The pretrial deadlines set by the Court's November 18, 2015 Scheduling Order are VACATED, with the exception of the December 4, 2015 status conference. The Court will consider new pretrial deadlines at the December 4, 2015 status conference. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/30/2015. (kcm)
November 24, 2015 Filing 430 NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re #419 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), [Plaintiffs' Notice of Timely Requests for Exclusion from the Class] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Class Administrator with List of Opt Outs)(Jensen, Rachel) (aef).
November 23, 2015 Filing 429 Joint MOTION to Vacate #424 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set Scheduling Order Hearing/Deadlines, [Joint Motion to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines Pending December 4, 2015 Status Conference or, Alternatively, Reschedule Pretrial Deadlines] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
November 23, 2015 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Kirman on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Kirman, David)Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
November 23, 2015 Filing 427 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Petrocelli, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER Denying #425 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/2015. (srm)
November 20, 2015 Filing 425 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Joint Motion for Order Consolidating Cases for Trial and Aligning Pretrial Schedules] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cohen Case Joint Discovery Plan)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. Status Hearing set for 12/4/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2015. (srm)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER: Granting In Part and Denying In Part #375 Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment; Granting In Part and Denying In Part #377 Defendant Trump University's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment. The Court Grants summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' claims for injunctive relief under the UCL, FAL, and CLRA. The Court Denies summary judgment as to all other claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2015. (srm)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document from Michael Bailey: Request for Services and Notices. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: L.Civ.R. 83.9 - Ex parte communication is prohibited. Not parties to the case. Missing Proof of service. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/3/2015.(srm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2015: #1 Rejected Document) (srm).
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER APPROVING Amended Return Postcard (Doc. #420 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/23/2015. (srm)
September 23, 2015 Filing 420 NOTICE by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff re #419 [Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Filing of Amended Return Postcard for Inclusion in the Mailed Notice] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Return Postcard)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #381 Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures: The Proposed Class Notices are approved for dissemination of class notice. The parties are authorized to make non-substantive changes to the notice, as long as they are acceptable to both parties, to reflect deadlines, mailing addresses, and similar information or to format the notice for printing. Plaintiffs will submit an amended Return Postcard that is consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the Order. Epiq Systems, Inc. is approved as "Notice Administrator" to supervise and carry out the notice procedure. The deadline for exclusion from the Class shall be forty-five (45) days after the Notice Date. The Notice Administrator is ordered to provide counsel for both parties with a list of all timely requests for exclusion within seven (7) business days after the Opt-Out Deadline. Plaintiffs are ordered to file such list with the Court within three (3) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/15. (dlg)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #380 Motion to Decertify Classes; Granting #410 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's Class Certification Order. The Court hereby: 1. DENIES Defendants' motion to decertify the class action on liability issues as to all causes of action; 2. GRANTS Defendants' motion to decertify on damages issues as to all causes of action and bifurcates the damage issues to follow trial on the liability phase; and 3. GRANTS Plaintiffs' application for clarification of the Court's class certification order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/18/2015. (aef)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Granting #406 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/2015. (jao)
June 17, 2015 Filing 415 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) on (srm).
June 4, 2015 Filing 414 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 5/22/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2015. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
May 22, 2015 Filing 413 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2015. #380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, #381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller, Ed Oberkrom ; Motions Submitted, Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
May 20, 2015 Filing 412 NOTICE CHANGE IN TIME for Hearing on Motion #380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action , #381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : Court reschedules the time for Motion Hearing to 01:00 PM on 5/22/2015 in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
May 1, 2015 Filing 411 REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits and Exhibits A-D in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq. in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 1, 2015 Filing 410 Ex Parte MOTION to Clarify [Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's Class Certification Order] by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
April 24, 2015 Filing 409 REPLY to Response to Motion re #380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump's Motion for Decertification of Class Action filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
April 17, 2015 Filing 408 RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
April 10, 2015 Filing 407 [Filed as Sealed Document on 6/29/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #406 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao). (Main Document 407 replaced on 6/29/2015) (jao).
April 10, 2015 Filing 406 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao).
April 10, 2015 Filing 405 RESPONSE in Opposition re #380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action [Redacted] filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-16 (Public) to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (kcm).
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #331 Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Request for Fees and Costs. The Court awards Makaeff $790,083.40 in fees; the Court awards Makaeff $8,695.81 in costs; the Court Grants #368 Makaeff's ex parte application to file a limited response. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/15. (dlg)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting Trump University, LLC and Donlad J. Trump's #401 Ex Parte Motion to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication. Court vacates the 4/3/2015 1:30 PM hearing date. Court will reset the hearing as necessary. Court vacates all other pre-trial dates (aside from the 5/22/2015 motion hearings). Court will reset the pre-trial dates as necessary. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/1/2015. (jah)
March 27, 2015 Filing 402 RESPONSE to Motion re #401 Ex Parte MOTION to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alter filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low, Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (kcm).
March 26, 2015 Filing 401 Ex Parte MOTION to Delay Issuance of Any Ruling on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Adjudication re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support)(Morris, Benjamin) (dlg).
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER Granting #399 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action (re Dkt. No. #380 ). The May 15, 2015 hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action is continued one week to May 22, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/24/15. (dlg)
March 24, 2015 Filing 399 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Decertification of Class Action [Dkt. No. 380] by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg In Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
March 23, 2015 Filing 398 RESPONSE re #392 Objection, [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER (1) Granting #373 Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal; (2) Granting #384 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/16/2015. (jao)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER Granting #389 Joint Motion And Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice Of Plaintiffs' Individual Non-Certified Claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/16/15. (dlg) Modified on 3/24/2015 to edit docket text (dlg).
March 13, 2015 Filing 392 OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #390 Reply to Response to Motion, #391 Reply to Response to Motion, Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Opposition to TU & DJT's Motions for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
March 13, 2015 Filing 391 REPLY to Response to Motion re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Trump University, LLC. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
March 13, 2015 Filing 390 REPLY to Response to Motion re #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald J Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
March 12, 2015 Filing 393 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/12/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
March 11, 2015 Filing 389 Joint MOTION to Dismiss [Joint Motion and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiffs' Individual Non-Certified Claims] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 7, 2015 Filing 388 RESPONSE to Motion re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment [Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Trump Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment] filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit 30, #27 Exhibit 31, #28 Exhibit 37, #29 Exhibit 40, #30 Exhibit 41, #31 Exhibit 42, #32 Exhibit 43, #33 Exhibit 44, #34 Exhibit 48, #35 Exhibit 49, #36 Exhibit 50, #37 Exhibit 51, #38 Exhibit 53, #39 Exhibit 54, #40 Exhibit 55, #41 Exhibit 56, #42 Exhibit 58, #43 Exhibit 59, #44 Exhibit 60, #45 Exhibit 61, #46 Exhibit 62, #47 Exhibit 63, #48 Exhibit 65, #49 Exhibit 66, #50 Exhibit 67)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 6, 2015 Filing 387 RESPONSE to Motion re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Facts and Additional Statement of Facts)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 6, 2015 Filing 386 RESPONSE in Opposition re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 6, 2015 Filing 385 [Filed as sealed document on 3/16/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #384 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao). (Main Document 385 replaced on 3/16/2015) (jao).
March 6, 2015 Filing 384 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (jao).
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : The Court set a hearing date of May 22, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendants shall file their opposition on or by April 17, 2015. Any reply shall be due by May 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action : The Court set a hearing date of May 15, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition on or by April 10, 2015. Any reply shall be due by April 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
February 20, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 19, 2015 Filing 380 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Mtn for Decertification, #2 Declaration of Stagg ISO Mtn for Decertification, #3 Exhibit 1 to Stagg Decl, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 to Stagg Decl, #5 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 to Stagg Decl, #6 Exhibit 3-13 to Stagg Decl)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Granting #378 Plaintiffs' Unnoposed Ex Parte Application To File Omnibus Opposition to Motions For Summary Judgment and Setting Briefing Schedule. The Court set a hearing date of April 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for both motions. Plaintiffs shall file their omnibus opposition on or by March 6, 2015. Any replies shallbe due by March 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/19/15. (dlg)
February 18, 2015 Filing 378 Ex Parte MOTION Unopposed re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment [Plaintiffs' Unopposed Ex Parte Application to File Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 17, 2015 Filing 377 MOTION for Summary Judgment Trump University, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 & 2 to N. Stagg Declaration, #4 Statement of Facts in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule re #375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment : The Court reschedules the hearing date from April 10, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. to April 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall respond on or by March 6, 2015. Any reply shall be due by March 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/15.(dlg)
February 12, 2015 Filing 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO MSJ, #2 Declaration of Stagg ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit 1-11 to Stagg Declaration, #4 Exhibit 12-26 to Stagg Declaration, #5 Statement of Facts ISO MSJ)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
February 12, 2015 Filing 374 [Filed as sealed document on 3/16/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #373 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stagg, Nancy) (sjt). (Main Document 374 replaced on 3/16/2015) (jao).
February 12, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy) (sjt).
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Granting #369 Defendant Donald L. Trump's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/15. (dlg)
February 11, 2015 Filing 371 RESPONSE to Motion re #369 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order Setting Combined Mandatory Settlement Conference: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 12, 2015, at 8:00 a.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel shall submit settlement statements directly to chambers no later than March 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/9/15.(dlg)
February 6, 2015 Filing 369 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
January 7, 2015 Filing 368 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Limited Response to Trump University, LLC's Evidentiary Objections and Requests to Strike] by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Makaeff's Limited Response, #2 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
December 23, 2014 Filing 367 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Trump University, LLC re #331 Notice (Other), #358 Order, in Opposition to Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn M.S. Catherwood in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to Catherwood Dec., #3 Evidentiary Objection to Supp Dec of R. Jensen, #4 Evidentiary Objection to Supp Dec of A. Eck)(Stagg, Nancy) (jpp).
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion to Quash and Denying Defendant/Counter Claimant Trump University, LLC's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/16/2014. (srm)
December 15, 2014 Filing 365 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Telephonic Discovery Conference) held on 12/11/2014, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2015. (akr)
December 15, 2014 Filing 364 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff re #331 Notice (Other), #358 Order, #363 Notice of Technical Failure [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Bill of Fees and Costs]. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen and Exs 1-2 thereto, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Amber L. Eck)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
December 15, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE of Technical Failure by Tarla Makaeff (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 & 2 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
December 11, 2014 Filing 362 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 12/11/2014. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel L. Jensen; Amber Lee Eck). (Defendant Attorney Nancy L. Stagg; Kathryn Catherwood). (no document attached) (gac)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Counsel for all parties to appearing telephonically with defense counsel initiating call. (no document attached) (gac)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Denying #355 Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/3/2014. (srm)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/20/2014.(vam)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing in Support of Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs (Doc. #331 ). Makaeff shall submit her supplemental brief by December 12, 2014, and Trump University may file a supplemental brief in opposition on or before December 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/18/2014. (srm)
November 17, 2014 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 MOTION re #352 Order [Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1-11)(Morris, Benjamin) (srm).
November 10, 2014 Filing 356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 11/10/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
November 7, 2014 Filing 355 MOTION re #352 Order [Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum Regarding Discovery Disputes] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-13 to Jensen Declaration, #3 Certificate of Compliance Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
November 7, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. Mueller on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Mueller, Maureen)Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (srm).
November 7, 2014 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Brandon Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Tarla Makaeff(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Ed Oberkrom(pty:pla) (srm).
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2014. (srm)
October 28, 2014 Filing 351 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 10/28/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Counsel only Discovery Conference set for 10/28/2014 07:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/27/2014. (srm)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 AMENDED Case Management Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings; Granting #346 Parties' Joint Motion to Revise Pretrial Schedule. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 5/22/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2015 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/1/2014. (srm)
September 29, 2014 Filing 348 PRO HAC APPROVED #347 : Jeffrey L. Goldman appearing for Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, Counter Claimant Trump University, LLC. (no document attached) (vam)
September 29, 2014 Filing 347 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7425861.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Goldman, Jeffrey) (vam).
September 24, 2014 Filing 346 Joint MOTION to Revise Pretrial Schedule re #309 Scheduling Order,, by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
September 11, 2014 Filing 345 Minute EntryThe Court sua sponte set a telephonic Status Conference, which was conducted on September 11, 2014, to discuss the pending Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC") now set for November 19, 2014. Mr. Jason Forge and Ms. Rachel Jensen participated on behalf of Plaintiffs, and Ms. Nancy Stagg and Ms. Jill Martin participated on behalf of Defendants. Based upon the discussion held with counsel, the Court determines that the MSC will be attended by the attorneys only (with clients on telephonic standby) and will remain as now set, subject to being rescheduled depending on the timing of the ruling on the Motion for Class Certification in Cohen v. Trump, Case. No. 13-CV-2519-GPC (WVG).(no document attached) (mcb)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 9/11/2014 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/5/2014. (srm)
August 6, 2014 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 8/6/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Minute ORDER granting #337 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/29/2014. (sjt)
July 25, 2014 Filing 339 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge, #2 Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration [Redacted portions filed under seal.], #3 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (cxl).
July 25, 2014 Filing 338 (Filed as Sealed Document 341 on 7/30/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #337 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason) (rlu). (Main Document 338 replaced on 7/30/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 7/30/2014 (sjt).
July 25, 2014 Filing 337 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (rlu).
July 22, 2014 Filing 336 NOTICE by Tarla Makaeff re #335 Objection to Bill of Costs,, [Plaintiff/Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff's Notice of Deficiency and Intended Non-Response Absent Court Request] (Jensen, Rachel)
July 18, 2014 Filing 335 Objection to Bill of Costs re #331 Notice (Other), filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn M.S. Catherwood in Support of Opposition, #2 Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen, #3 Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Amber L. Eck, #4 Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Carol A. Sobel, #5 Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Eric Alan Isaacson, #6 Evidentiary Objections/Motion to Strike Declaration of Karl Olson)(Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Order Setting Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 8/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/18/2014. (srm)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER on Discovery Dispute re #330 Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court Sustains Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' ROGs Set Five. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/11/2014. (srm)
July 7, 2014 Filing 332 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/7/2014(no document attached) (mcb)
July 3, 2014 Filing 331 NOTICE by Tarla Makaeff re #328 Order,, [Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff's Bill of Fees and Costs] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen and Exhibits 1-7 thereto, #2 Declaration of Amber L. Eck and Exhibits 1-4 thereto, #3 Declaration of Eric Alan Isaacson, #4 Declaration of Karl Olson and Exhibits A-B thereto, #5 Declaration of Carol A. Sobel and Exhibits A-B thereto)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
July 2, 2014 Filing 330 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-7 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. Telephonic, counsel only Discovery Conference set for 7/7/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/25/2014. (srm)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Granting Plaintiff/Counter Defendant's Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant's Defamation Counterclaim (Dkt. Nos. #14 , #282 , #294 ). Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Makaeff shall file with the Court substantiation of the reasonable attorney's fees and costs associated with bringing the Motion to Strike, related appeal, and supplemental briefing by 7/3/2014. Defendant Makaeff's bill of fees and costs shall be filed by 7/18/2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/2014. (srm)
June 13, 2014 Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014. #28 Pursuant to Remand by 9th U.S Court of Appeals. #14 Plaintiff mot strike defendant Trump University LLC's counterclaim against her for defamation-Submitted, #31 Plaintiff Motion for Reconsideration-Submitted. Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Helen Zeldes). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting Defendant's #301 Motion to File Documents Under Seal and #310 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Clerk directed to file requested documents under seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/13/2014. (jah)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Granting #322 Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump. It is Ordered that Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of David K. Schneider and Stephen F. Yunker of Yunker & Schneider. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Trump University, LLC and Donald J. Trump. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/2014. (srm)
May 2, 2014 Filing 322 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) Modified on 5/2/2014. QC Mailer sent re proposed orders (srm).
April 24, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Morris on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Morris, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
April 24, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Stagg on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Stagg, Nancy)Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
April 18, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom [Plaintiffs' Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Thomas R. Merrick] (Jensen, Rachel)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER of USCA in USCA Case Number 14-80031. The petition for permission to appeal is untimely because it was filed on March 10, 2014, more than 14 days after the February 21, 2014 USDC order. Petitioners' contention that the provisions of FRCP 25(a)(2)(B) apply are unpersuasive, as a petition for permission to appeal is neither a "brief or appendix." Accordingly, we deny this petition for permission to appeal as untimely. All pending motions are denied as moot. (akr)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Continuing Hearing. The hearing date of 03/28/2014 is continued to 06/13/2014 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 03/24/2014. (cc:USM)(ag)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Granting #315 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/21/2014. (srm)
March 21, 2014 Filing 315 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (ag).
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Granting #313 Trump University's Ex Party Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical/Media Equipment in the Courtroom for the March 28, 2014 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/2014. (srm)
March 19, 2014 Filing 313 Ex Parte MOTION Allow media equipment in courtroom re #283 Order, Set Hearings,,,, Re Reconsider Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm). Modified event on 3/20/2014 (srm).
March 14, 2014 Filing 312 REPLY - Other re #294 Supplemental Briefing,, [Reply in Support of Plaintiff/Counter defendant Makaeff's Supplemental Brief Regarding Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant Trump University's Counterclaim Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. P. 425.16] filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 14 thru 19 to the Jensen Declaration [REDACTED])(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
March 14, 2014 Filing 311 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/13/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #310 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu). (Main Document 311 replaced on 6/13/2014) (jah). Modified on 6/13/2014 - Added file date of lodgment(jah).
March 14, 2014 Filing 310 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: On March 14, 2014, at 8:00 a.m., the Court held a telephonic Status Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/10/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/2014. (srm)
March 14, 2014 Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/14/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
March 10, 2014 Filing 307 USCA Case Number 14-80031 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f) filed by Trump University, LLC, Donald J. Trump. (akr)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MINUTE ORDER: the March 12, 2014 Status Conference is Vacated. The Court will instead hold a telephonic, counsel only Status Conference on 3/14/2014 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/6/2014. (srm)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 3/12/2014 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/4/2014. (srm)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Granting Defendants' Ex Parte #299 Motion to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit to Defendants' Supplemental Opposition. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/28/2014. (rlu)
February 28, 2014 Filing 303 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Martin, Jill) (rlu).
February 28, 2014 Filing 302 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/13/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Martin, Jill) (rlu). (Main Document 302 replaced on 6/13/2014) (jah). Modified on 6/13/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
February 28, 2014 Filing 301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Martin, Jill) (rlu).
February 28, 2014 Filing 300 RESPONSE re #283 Trump University's Supplemental Opposition to Makaeff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jill A. Martin in Support of Supplemental Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 5-14 to Declaration of Jill A. Martin)(Martin, Jill) (srm).
February 28, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION for Leave to File a Video as a Non-Electronic Document by Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:cc) (srm).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part #122 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Action, Appoint Class Representatives, and Appoint Class Counsel; (2) Denying Motions to Strike (Docs. 138-2, #196 , #211 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/2014. (srm)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER Granting #292 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/18/2014. (srm)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Accepting Document, from Defendants Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC, re #291 Notice (Supplemental documents). Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(a),(g): Docket entry does not accurately reflect the document filed, OTHER: Supplemental documents require court order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. (srm)
February 14, 2014 Filing 294 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff, Counter Defendant Tarla Makaeff re #283 Order, Set Hearings, [Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Makaeff's Supplemental Brief Regarding Special Motion to Strike Defendant/Counterclaimant Trump Universitys Counterclaim Pursuant to California Code Of Civil Procedure 425.16 [REDACTED]]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-13 [Redacted] to Jensen Declaration, #3 Declaration of Tarla Makaeff in Support thereof and Exhibits 1 & 2 thereto)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
February 14, 2014 Filing 293 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/18/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #292 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(rlu). (Main Document 293 replaced on 2/18/2014) (rlu). Modified on 2/18/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
February 14, 2014 Filing 292 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
February 14, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Supplemental Documents Just Produced By Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Martin, Jill)
February 7, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 11/8/2013, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (akr)
February 4, 2014 Filing 289 REPLY - Other re #287 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm).
February 3, 2014 Filing 288 RESPONSE re #287 Request for Judicial Notice [Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Judicial Notice] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
January 31, 2014 Filing 287 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Jill) (srm).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER Granting #285 Joint Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff supplemental briefing due by February 14, 2014. Defendant opposition or statement of non-opposition due by February 28, 2014. Any Reply due by March 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/17/2014. (srm)
January 17, 2014 Filing 285 Joint MOTION to Revise Briefing Schedule re #283 Order, Set Hearings, by Tarla Makaeff. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellant's unopposed motion to transfer consideration of attorneys' fees to the USDC pursuant to Circuit Rule 39-1.8 is granted. (akr)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Setting Rehearing Date and Issuing Briefing Schedule. The Court sets a Rehearing for 3/28/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel to reconsider Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant Trump University, LLC's counterclaim against Plaintiff for defamation, (Dkt. No. #14 ), and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, (Dkt. No. #31 ). Supplemental briefing due by January 31, 2014. Defendant Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition due by February 14, 2014. Any reply due by February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/12/2013. (srm)
December 10, 2013 Filing 282 MANDATE of USCA reversing the decision of the USDC and remanding for further proceedings as to #43 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (akr)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellee's petition for rehearing en banc, filed April 30, 2013, is denied. Judge Watford's dissent from denial of en banc rehearing, and Judges Wardlaw and Callahan's concurrence in the denial of en banc rehearing, are filed concurrently with this Order. (See Order for full text. This Order is for publication.) (akr). (Main Document 281 replaced on 11/27/2013 with corrected Order issued by the USCA. Correction was made to indicate that Judges Wardlaw and Callahan authored the concurrence.) (akr).
November 22, 2013 Filing 280 RESPONSE re #279 Notice (Other), of correction re Nov. 8, 2013 hearing filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (srm).
November 16, 2013 Filing 279 NOTICE [of Correction Regarding the November 8, 2013 Hearing] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re 278 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike,, Motion Hearing, Motions Submitted (Jensen, Rachel) (ag).
November 8, 2013 Filing 278 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2013.Motions Submitted #211 MOTION to Strike #195 Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument, #196 MOTION to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposit, #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel]. The Court will prepare written Order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Lee Eck, Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney David K. Schneider, Jill A. Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Granting #276 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for November 8, 2013 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/6/2013. (srm)
November 4, 2013 Filing 276 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for the November 8, 2013 Hearing by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
October 22, 2013 Filing 275 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom of case(s) 3:13-cv-02519 . (Forge, Jason) Modified on 10/23/2013, low number order not prepared, case transferred to Judge Curiel as of 10/22/2013 (srm).
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER: (1) Denying #272 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to File Supplemental Briefing; (2) Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set on class certification and all related motions (Dkt. Nos. #122 , 138-2, #196 , #211 ) for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/15/2013. (srm)
October 11, 2013 Filing 273 RESPONSE to Motion re #272 Ex Parte MOTION Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel re New Development re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
October 10, 2013 Filing 272 Ex Parte MOTION Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel re New Development re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Martin, Jill) (jao).
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Denying #248 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/07/2013. (ag)
October 2, 2013 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ann Martin on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Donald J Trump(pty:dft), Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Trump University, LLC(pty:dft) (srm).
October 1, 2013 Filing 269 NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC of Association of Counsel (Schneider, David) Modified on 10/1/2013, QC Mailer sent (srm).
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Granting #256 , #262 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/11/2013. (srm).
September 5, 2013 Filing 265 NOTICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #264 Objection (Errata) (Schneider, David) (srm).
September 4, 2013 Filing 264 OBJECTION by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC re #261 Supplemental Document, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (srm).
September 4, 2013 Filing 263 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #262 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 263 replaced on 9/11/2013) (rlu). Modified on 9/11/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
September 4, 2013 Filing 262 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
September 3, 2013 Filing 261 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re #248 MOTION to Amend/Correct #128 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to Forge Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Forge Decl.)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
September 3, 2013 Filing 260 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/30/2013, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2013. (akr)
August 30, 2013 Filing 259 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2013. #248 MOTION to Amend/Correct #128 Amended Complaint filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom ; Motions Submitted. Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck).(Defendant Attorney David Schneider). (no document attached) (lsf)
August 26, 2013 Filing 258 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #256 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason) (rlu). (Main Document 258 replaced on 9/11/2013) (rlu). Modified on 9/11/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
August 23, 2013 Filing 257 REPLY to Response to Motion re #248 MOTION to Amend/Correct #128 Amended Complaint [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to Forge Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (aef).
August 23, 2013 Filing 256 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (rlu).
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Granting #251 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/2013. (srm)
August 16, 2013 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #248 MOTION to Amend/Correct #128 Amended Complaint filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #2 Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of David K. Schneider, #3 Exhibit 5-10 to Declaration of David K. Schneider, #4 Exhibit 11-18 to Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (srm).
August 16, 2013 Filing 252 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/19/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #251 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 252 replaced on 8/19/2013) (rlu). Modified on 8/19/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
August 16, 2013 Filing 251 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Court vacates hearings scheduled 8/16/2013. All Motions related Class Certification. #196 Motions to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposition filed: 02/02/2013 Filed by: Ed Oberkrom; #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion filed: 09/24/2012 Filed by: Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom; #211 MOTION to Strike #195 Reply to Response to Motion, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument Motion filed: 04/26/2013 Filed by: Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump (no document attached) (lsf)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Continuing Hearing on #248 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Setting Briefing Schedule; and Vacating hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing on #248 Continued to 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Responses due by 8/16/2013 Replies due by 8/23/2013. The Court VACATES the hearing set for August 16, 2013 on Plaintiffs' motion to certify the class and related motions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/5/2013. (srm)
August 2, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION to Amend/Correct #128 Amended Complaint by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit A to Forge Declaration - Draft [Proposed] Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Forge Declaration - Excerpt of Trump U's Response to Plaintiffs' 2nd Set of Interrogatories)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
July 29, 2013 Filing 247 Minute Entry. The Discovery Conference set for 7/29/2013 is hereby VACATED.(no document attached) (mcb)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Attorneys Only Discovery Conference set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/24/2013.(srm)
July 16, 2013 Filing 245 SUR-REPLY - re #233 Reply to Response to Motion,, to Strike Defendants' Declarations filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER: Granting #237 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; and Granting #242 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Defendants shall file their sur-reply by 7/16/2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (leh)
July 8, 2013 Filing 242 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
July 3, 2013 Filing 241 RESPONSE re #239 Supplemental Document,, filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #2 Exhibit A and B to Declaration of David K. Schneider)(Schneider, David) (rlu).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Consumer Attorneys of California's motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in opposition to defendant-counter-claimant-appellee Trump University's Petition for Rehearing En Banc is granted. (akr)
June 26, 2013 Filing 239 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] [[Supplemental Document: Speaker Script, the Existence of Which Defendants Have Denied to Magistrate Judge Gallo and This Court]]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit 3)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
June 26, 2013 Filing 238 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/15/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #237 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (leh). (Main Document 238 replaced on 7/16/2013) (rlu). Modified on 7/16/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
June 26, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason)(leh).
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Granting #231 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2013. (srm)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. The Court Continues the hearing date on #122 , #196 , and #211 to 8/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2013. (srm)
June 21, 2013 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #196 MOTION to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposit [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations (REDACTED)] filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in support thereof [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit 145-153 [REDACTED])(Eck, Amber) (srm).
June 21, 2013 Filing 232 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/24/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #231 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Eck, Amber) (rlu). (Main Document 232 replaced on 6/25/2013) (rlu). Modified on 6/25/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
June 21, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Eck, Amber) (rlu).
June 21, 2013 Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re #211 MOTION to Strike #195 Reply to Response to Motion and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting Motions to File Documents Under Seal: #204 and #219 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/18/2013. (sjt)
June 17, 2013 Filing 222 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Discovery Hearing) held on 2/22/2013, before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. (akr)
June 14, 2013 Filing 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re #211 MOTION to Strike #195 Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 138-144 [Public Version] to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
June 14, 2013 Filing 220 (Filed as Sealed Document 229 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #219 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(leh). (Main Document 220 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
June 14, 2013 Filing 219 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (leh).
June 14, 2013 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Forge on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Forge, Jason) (srm).
June 12, 2013 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F Yunker on behalf of Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC (Yunker, Stephen) (srm).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Makaeff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc is granted. The response is now due June 13, 2013. (akr)
May 8, 2013 Filing 215 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) (srm).
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Tarla Makaeff. Appellant is directed to file a response to the Petition for Rehearing En Banc filed with the USCA on April 30, 2013. Briefing and filing instructions and due date issued. (akr)
April 26, 2013 Filing 213 REPLY - Other re #195 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Evidence [Dkt. 195-9] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
April 26, 2013 Filing 212 REPLY - Other re #192 Response in Support of Motion, to Strike Declarations of Schnackenberg, Sommer, Donnelly and Nicholas filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (srm).
April 26, 2013 Filing 211 MOTION to Strike #195 Reply to Response to Motion,,, and Objections to Improper Evidence and Argument by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Supporting Motion to Strike and Objections to Evidence in Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #3 Modified on 4/29/2013 (srm).
April 26, 2013 Filing 210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposit filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider [redacted], #2 Exhibit 122, #3 Exhibit 138)(Schneider, David) (srm).
April 26, 2013 Filing 209 (Filed as Sealed Document 228 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 209 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filnig date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
April 26, 2013 Filing 208 (Filed as Sealed Document 227 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 208 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgment on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
April 26, 2013 Filing 207 (Filed as Sealed Document 226 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 207 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgment on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
April 26, 2013 Filing 206 (Filed as Sealed Document 225 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 206 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
April 26, 2013 Filing 205 (Filed as Sealed Document 224 on 6/18/2013) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) qc email re multiple sealed lodged proposed document entries entered when only one entry was needed on 4/26/2013 (rlu). (Main Document 205 replaced on 6/18/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/18/2013 (sjt).
April 26, 2013 Filing 204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) (rlu).
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER on Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/12/2013. (srm) (jcj).
February 25, 2013 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 2/22/2013(no document attached) (mcb)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE ORDER: Counsel Only Discovery Hearing set for 2/22/2013 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 1E, First Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/14/2013. (srm) (jcj).
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Granting #193 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/11/2013. (srm)
February 4, 2013 Filing 198 REDACTION to #196 MOTION to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposit Plainitffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Declarations [REDACTED] by Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
February 2, 2013 Filing 197 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
February 2, 2013 Filing 196 MOTION to Strike #143 Response in Opposition to Motion, #140 Response in Opposition to Motion, #139 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #141 Response in Opposition to Motion, #138 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #142 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Declaration by Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
February 1, 2013 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 68-71, 74, & 79 to Jensen Decl, #3 Exhibit 80-81 to Jensen Decl, #4 Exhibit 83, 92-93 to Jensen Decl, #5 Exhibit 94-95, 97, 100-102, 104-105, 107 to Jensen Decl, #6 Exhibit 110, 128-130 to Jensen Decl, #7 Exhibit 132, 135 to Jensen Decl, #8 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Trial Plan, #9 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Evidence)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
February 1, 2013 Filing 194 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/11/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel)(rlu). (Main Document 194 replaced on 2/15/2013) (rlu). Modified on 2/15/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
February 1, 2013 Filing 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
February 1, 2013 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Support re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amber L. Eck, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Eck, Amber) (srm).
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #122 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel: Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/31/2013. (srm) (jcj).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following listed case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Cathy Ann Bencivengo to the calendar of the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. All conference, trial or hearing dates set before District Judge Bencivengo, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before District Judge Curiel. Any dates set before any magistrate judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10CV0940-GPC WVG. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 01/30/2013.(yeb) (jcj).
January 18, 2013 Filing 189 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 1/18/2013(no document attached) (mcb)
December 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER On Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/24/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #185 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #122 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Extending Page Limit. T IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted: An extension for submission of their class certification reply from January 14, 2013 to February 1, 2013; and A page limit extension for Plaintiffs class certification reply brief from 15 pages to 20 pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing date for the motion for class certification (currently set for February 12, 2013) is HEREBY CONTINUED to March 28, 2013 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/21/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
December 20, 2012 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #119 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Regarding Class Certification Reply Deadline and Page Limit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David) (jao).
December 19, 2012 Filing 185 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #119 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages , Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Regarding Class Certification Reply Deadline and Page Limit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support Thereof)(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
December 13, 2012 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 12/12/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER re 182 Notice of Discovery Hearing. On December 12, 2012, at 3:30 p.m., a Discovery Hearing will be held before United States MagistrateJudge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom F, First Floor, 221 West Broadway,San Diego, California. Only counsel must participate and shall be present before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/11/2012.(yeb)
December 11, 2012 Filing 182 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 12/12/2012 03:30 PM in Courtroom F before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (no document attached) (jmy)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting Defendant's #137 Application to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered November 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/3/2012. (rlu)
December 3, 2012 Filing 162 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 162 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 161 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 161 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 160 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 160 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 159 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 159 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 158 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 158 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 157 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 157 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 156 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 156 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 155 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 155 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 154 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 154 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 153 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David)(rlu). (Main Document 153 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 152 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 152 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 151 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 151 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 150 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 150 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 149 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 149 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 148 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 148 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 147 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 147 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 146 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 146 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 145 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/3/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneider, David) (rlu). (Main Document 145 replaced on 12/4/2012) (rlu). Modified on 12/4/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
December 3, 2012 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC on Application to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered 11/17/11 (Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 17 to 121 to Opposition, Exhibits 17 to 39 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40-70, #2 Exhibit 71-99, #3 Exhibit 100-121)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 10 to 16 part 13 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 10 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 part 11, #2 Exhibit 16 part 12, #3 Exhibit 16 part 13)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 6 to 16 part 9 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 6 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 part 7, #2 Exhibit 16 part 8, #3 Exhibit 16 part 9)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 16 part 2 to 16 part 5 to Opposition, Exhibit 16 part 2 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 part 3, #2 Exhibit 16 part 4, #3 Exhibit 16 part 5)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] Exhibits 1-16 part 1 to Opposition, Exhibits 1-6 filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 part 1, #2 Exhibit 7 part 2, #3 Exhibit 7 part 3, #4 Exhibit 7 part 4, #5 Exhibit 8-15, #6 Exhibit 16 part 1)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider in Opposition, #2 Motion to Strike Declarations of Schnackenberg, Sommer, Nicholas and Donnelly, #3 Declaration of David K. Schneider in Support of Motion to Strike Declarations, #4 Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence, #5 Objection to Plaintiffs' Trial Plan)(Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 30, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schneider, David) qc email re pos and corresponding proposed lodged sealed filing on 12/3/2012 (rlu).
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion for Leave to Allow the Non-electronic Filing of Video as Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/29/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
November 28, 2012 Filing 135 Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David) (yeb).
November 2, 2012 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 11/2/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 11/2/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/1/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
October 31, 2012 Filing 132 ANSWER to #128 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump.(Schneider, David)(yeb).
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER: This Court held a telephonic Status Conference on October 10, 2012. During the Conference, counsel brought several discovery issues to the Courts attention. The Court will hold another telephonic Status Conference on January 18, 2013, at 8:00 a.m. Only counsel must participate and the Court will initiate the call. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/18/2013 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/12/2012.(yeb)
October 10, 2012 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/10/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
September 27, 2012 Filing 129 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (yeb)
September 26, 2012 Filing 128 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Third Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Ed Oberkrom, Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller. New Summons Requested. (Eck, Amber) (yeb).
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. The TACC shall be filed on or before 10/5/2012. The hearing set for 10/05/2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 09/25/2012. (ag) (jcj).
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #123 Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.2 and the Protective Order Entered 11/17/2011. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/25/2012. (rlu)
September 24, 2012 Filing 124 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/25/2012] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #123 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Jensen, Rachel) (rlu). (Main Document 124 replaced on 9/25/2012) (rlu). Modified on 9/25/2012 to add file date of lodgment (rlu).
September 24, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Jensen, Rachel) (rlu).
September 24, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel] by Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-20 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, #4 Exhibit 21-39 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, #5 Exhibit 40-66 [Redacted] to Eck Decl, #6 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #7 Appendix I & Exhibits A-H thereto)(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
September 21, 2012 Filing 121 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct #41 Amended Complaint, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint] filed by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David)(yeb).
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #118 Joint Motion for Leave to Allow Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2012. (jah)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Pages Limitation Purduant to Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2012. (jah)
September 20, 2012 Filing 118 Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Videos as Exhibits to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (knb).
September 20, 2012 Filing 117 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Jensen, Rachel) (cge).
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #113 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/8/12. (kaj)
July 31, 2012 Filing 114 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/8/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #113 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Jensen, Rachel)(leh). (Main Document 114 replaced on 8/9/2012) (kaj). Modified on 8/9/2012 to add file date of lodgment (kaj).
July 31, 2012 Filing 113 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Jensen, Rachel)(leh).
July 31, 2012 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Amend/Correct #41 Amended Complaint, [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint] by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, #2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #3 Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits to Jensen Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C (Redacted))(Jensen, Rachel)(yeb).
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER on Discovery Disputes Involving Redactions re 110 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DENIES the request of both parties for an order that the documents at issue be un-redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 06/26/2012.(yeb) (jcj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 6/18/2012(no document attached) (mcb)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/18/2012 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/12.(cge) (jcj).
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #106 Joint Motion to Revise Schedule; amended scheduling order regulating pre-class certification discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/10/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Motion for Class Certification due 9/24/12. Opposition to Motion due 11/30/12. Reply due 1/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/7/12. (cge) (jcj).
June 6, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re #106 Joint MOTION to Revise Schedule re #92 Order, Set Hearings filed by Tarla Makaeff, Brandon Keller, Ed Oberkrom Notice of Withdrawal of Exhibit A to Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support of Joint Motion to Revise Schedule. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
June 4, 2012 Filing 106 Joint MOTION to Revise Schedule re #92 Order, Set Hearings by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit A to Eck Declaration)(Eck, Amber)(yeb).
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying #104 Motion to Revise Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
May 24, 2012 Filing 104 Joint MOTION Revise Schedule re #92 Order, Set Hearings by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on Discovery Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/08/2012.(ag) (jcj).
March 28, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom (Olsen, Aaron)(yeb).
March 20, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom re #93 Order, #95 Order Notice of Plaintiffs' Submission of Documents for In Camera Review Pursuant to the Court's Orders on Discovery Issues (Merrick, Thomas)(yeb).
March 13, 2012 Filing 100 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David)(yeb).
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 03/08/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
March 7, 2012 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #93 Order, #95 Order February 13, 2012 and March 2, 2012 Orders on Discovery Disputes by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Ed Oberkrom. (Merrick, Thomas)(yeb).
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Dismiss Party. Dismissing Patricia Murphy Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/06/2012. (yeb) (jcj).
March 5, 2012 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Patrica Murphy's Claims with Prejudice by Patricia Murphy. (Eck, Amber)(yeb).
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER on Discovery Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/2/12.(lmt) (jcj).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This Case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Irma E. Gonzalez to the calendar of the Honorable Cathy Ann Bencivengo. All pending motion hearing and pretrial conference dates on Judge Gonzalez's calendar are VACATED to be rescheduled by Judge Bencivengo. All other dates set forth in scheduling orders, including discovery and motion cutoffs, and all hearings calendared before the magistrate judges remain as scheduled. The new case number is 10cv940 CAB(WVG). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/15/12.(lmt)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER on Discovery Disputes. Court rules on the specific discovery requests in Appendices A through E to this Order and orders parties to proceed as instructed therein. Parties shall comply with this Order by 3/12/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/13/2012. (jah) (jcj).
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Amended Scheduling Order Regulating Pre-Class Certification Discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/17/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/23/2012.(knb) (jcj).
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/16/2011. (jah) (jcj).
November 16, 2011 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 11/17/2011 - Proposed Order attached. Email sent to Atty re ECF Proposed Order policy. Removed duplicate attachment description (jah).
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER of USCA as to #43 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tarla Makaeff. The appellant's motion for leave to file an oversize reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the previously submitted reply brief. (akr)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference was held on 10/7/2011. Discovery shall commence immediately. Any motion to join other parties, to amend the pleadings, to file additional pleadings shall be filed by 7/31/2012. Plaintiffs shall file motion for class certification by 3/20/2012. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/27/2012 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/14/2011. (jah) (jcj).
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF CONTACT INFORMATION. Defendants shall produce name, address and telephone number of the 10,000 or so persons who enrolled in, and paid for, a Trump University class, course, or seminar, and who did not receive a full refund within the refund period, to the extent the information exists. Defendants shall comply by 10/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/14/2011. (jah) (jcj).
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Compelling Production of Contact Information. Case Management Conference was held on 10/7/2011. Defendants shall produce the name, address, and telephone number of each person who enrolled in a Trump University class, course, or seminar to the extent that information exists. Defendants shall comply by 10/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/13/2011. (jah)
October 7, 2011 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Case Management Conference held on 10/7/2011(ajf)
September 26, 2011 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 9/26/2011(ajf)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER. Discovery Teleconference set for 9/26/2011 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/20/2011. (jah) (jcj).
September 16, 2011 Filing 82 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN. (Merrick, Thomas). Modified on 9/19/2011 - Discovery document attached. Per Order #80 should be lodged. Email sent to Atty. Corrected text to match pleading (jah).
August 19, 2011 Filing 81 AMENDED ANSWER to #41 Second Amended Complaint, by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David). (jah).
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/12/2011. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 9/6/2011. Discovery plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Gallo by 9/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2011 07:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Counsel shall participate by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/15/2011. (jah) (jrl).
August 12, 2011 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/12/2011(ajf)
August 9, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Merrick on behalf of Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom (Merrick, Thomas). (jah).
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER dismissing #72 without prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike; granting #76 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Answer. Defendants may file an amended answer on or before 9/9/2011. Motion hearing set for 8/29/2011 is vacated. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/26/2011. (aef) (jcj).
July 25, 2011 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Donald J Trump, Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David)(aef).
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying Defendant Donald Trump's #73 Motion for Alan Garten to Appear on Behalf of Donald J. Trump at ENE Conference. Mr. Trump is ordered to appear in person. All Plaintiffs are ordered to appear in person as well. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 8/12/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom F before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/15/2011. (jah) (jcj).
July 14, 2011 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION for Alan Garten to Appear on Behalf of Donald J. Trump at ENE Conference filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support Thereof)(Eck, Amber). (jah).
July 11, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION for Alan Garten to Appear on Behalf of Donald J. Trump at ENE Conference by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald J. Trump, #2 Declaration of Alan J. Garten)(Schneider, David). Modified on 7/12/2011 - Edited attachment descriptions (jah).
July 8, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike #71 Answer to Amended Complaint by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix A)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 7/11/2011 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
June 17, 2011 Filing 71 ANSWER to #41 Second Amended Complaint, by Trump University, LLC, Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 6/20/2011 - Edited text (jah).
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Trump University's #50 Motion to Dismiss and denying #51 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs' 349 claims are dismissed w/o prejudice. Plaintiff Patricia Murphy's fraud, misrepresentation, and false promises claims are dismissed w/o prejudice. Defendant's motions are denied in all other respects. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint. If Plaintiffs wish to do so, they should file their third amended complaint w/in 14 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/16/2011. (jah) (jrl).
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Donald Trump's #59 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' statutory claims are dismissed w/ prejudice. Plaintiffs Oberkrom and Murphy's UCL and CLRA claims are dismissed w/ prejudice. Plaintiffs' 349 claims are dismissed w/o prejudice. Defendant's motion is denied in all other respects. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint. If Plaintiffs wish to do so, they should file their third amended complaint w/in 14 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/16/2011. (jah) (jrl).
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiffs' #66 Motion to Allow the Use of Media Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/16/2011. (jah) Modified text on 3/18/2011 (jcj).
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, Court submits- #50 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) Filed by: Trump University, LLC; submits- #51 Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f); submits- #59 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) Filed by: Donald J Trump, and will prepare a written order. Motion hearing scheduled for 3/21/2011 is vacated. (lsf)
March 15, 2011 Filing 66 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow Counsel for Plaintiffs to Bring Media Equipment in the Courtroom for the March 21, 2011 Motions Hearing by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 3/16/2011 - Corrected motion event (jah).
March 14, 2011 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 3/15/2011 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
March 14, 2011 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Strike Under Rule 12(f) filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 3/15/2011 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
March 14, 2011 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
March 7, 2011 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber). (jah).
March 7, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Strike Under Rule 12(f) filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 3/8/2011 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
March 7, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 3/8/2011 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
February 15, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David) (lmt).
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Trump University's #46 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Court grants Trump University's request to stay proceedings on its counterclaim only. Proceedings on Trump University's counterclaim are stayed pending resolution of Makaeff's appeal of Court's denial of her anti-SLAPP motion. Court denies Trump University's motion to stay proceedings on Pla's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/11/2011. (jah) (jcj).
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #41 Second Amended Complaint. Deadline for Defendant Donald J Trump to file answer to the Second Amended Complaint shall be 2/15/2011. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/4/2011. (jah)
February 4, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Brandon Keller, Tarla Makaeff, Patricia Murphy, Ed Oberkrom (Roach, Paula). Modified on 2/7/2011 - Wrong event, should be motion. Atty Roach termed as counsel of record (jah).
February 3, 2011 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Donald J Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David) Modified on 2/3/2011 - Edited text (jah).
February 1, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment: Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Trump University, LLC re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b)(Schneider, David). Modified on 2/1/2011 - Edited text (jah).
February 1, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment: Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Trump University, LLC re #51 MOTION to Strike Under Rule 12(f) (Schneider, David). Modified on 2/1/2011 - Edited text (jah).
January 31, 2011 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Tarla Makaeff for proceedings held on 8/4/2010 re #43 Notice of Appeal. (akr)
January 31, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION to Strike Under Rule 12(f) by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 2/1/2011 - Points and Authorities missing signature. Email sent to Atty to file Corrected Points ansd Authorities (jah).
January 31, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 2/1/2011 - Points and Authorities not signed. Email sent to Atty to file Corrected Points and Authorities (jah).
January 24, 2011 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
January 19, 2011 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). (jah).
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER re #46 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Trump University, LLC.. Plaintiffs must file opposition by 1/19/2011, should they seek to oppose Dfts' motion. Defendants must file any reply by 1/24/2011. Absent a further order, Court will not hear oral argument. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/12/2011.(jah) (av1).
January 10, 2011 Filing 46 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David) (jer).
January 4, 2011 Filing 45 USCA Time Schedule Order for #43 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (cc: Court Reporter). (akr)
January 4, 2011 Filing 44 USCA Case Number 11-55016 for #43 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (akr)
January 3, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #40 Order denying Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion for Reconsideration, #24 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim, by Tarla Makaeff. (Filing fee $455 receipt number 0974-3184034.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Eck, Amber). Modified on 1/3/2011 to edit the text re the Orders being appealed. (akr).
December 17, 2010 Filing 42 Summons on Second Amended Complaint Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jah)(mam).
December 16, 2010 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)New Summons Requested. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 12/17/2010 - Edited to remove duplicate text (jah). Modified on 12/17/2010 - Summons issued (jah). Modified on 7/27/2011 (jrl).
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #31 Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Tarla Makaeff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 23, 2010, Order denying her Motion to Strike Trump University's counterclaims. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/6/10. (lao) (jrl).
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Trump University shall have until 1/31/2011 to file a response to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/18/2010. (Second Amended Complaint not on file) (jah) (jrl).
November 18, 2010 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Second Amended Complaint by Trump University, LLC. (Schneider, David). Modified on 11/18/2010 - Corrected motion event (jah).
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file Second Amended Complaint shall be extended 45 days, to 12/16/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/27/2010. (jah) (jrl).
October 21, 2010 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). (jah).
October 18, 2010 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order Denying Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Amber L. Eck, #2 Table of Contents and Exhibits A-B to Supplemental Decl of Amber L. Eck)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 10/19/2010 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, Court submits- #31 Motion for Reconsideration re #24 Order Denying Motion to Strike Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff, and will prepare written order. Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2010 is vacated. (lsf)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss. Motion is denied as to claims of breach of contract, breach of implied covenant, money had and received, and violation of California Unfair Competition Law. Motion is granted as claims for negligent misrepresentation, fraud and false promise, under Rule 9(b) for failure to allege claims w/ sufficient particularity. Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' CLRA claims is granted to extent claim is based on advertisement of the seminars w/ intent to not supply reasonably expectable demand. Motion is granted on Plaintiffs' claim for violation of the False Advertising Law as to Plaintiff Tarla Makaeff. Motion is granted as to claim for elder abuse. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint to cure the deficiencies within 20 days of the filing date of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/12/2010. (jah) (jrl).
October 12, 2010 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order Denying Motion to Strike Counterclaim MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order Denying Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Sexton, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
September 20, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order Denying Motion to Strike Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amber L. Eck, #3 Exhibits A-C to decl of Amber Eck)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 9/21/2010 - Edited to remove duplicate text (jah).
September 16, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/4/2010, before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2010. (akr)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, Court Submits- #16 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2) Filed by: Trump University, LLC, and will prepare a written order. Motion hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 is vacated. (lsf)
September 7, 2010 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2) filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 9/8/2010 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Counterclaim. Counterdefendant Tarla Makaeff shall have an extension of two weeks to file a response to the counterclaim. Answer to counterclaim due 9/21/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/3/2010. (jah)(jrl).
September 2, 2010 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 9/3/2010 - Corrected motion type (jah).
August 30, 2010 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2)filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 8/31/2010 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Strike #4 Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/23/2010. (jah)(jrl).
August 4, 2010 Filing 23 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez:Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2010, #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim filed by Tarla Makaeff -Submitted, court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter F. Rangus.)(Plaintiff Attorney Amber Lee Eck, Helen Zeldes).(Defendant Attorney David Schneider). (lsf)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Continuing Hearing re #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim. Due to conflict on Court's calendar, Motion Hearing currently set for 8/4/2010 9:00am is rescheduled for 8/4/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/3/2010.(jah) (jrl).
August 2, 2010 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY - re #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Defendant Trump University, LLC is granted leave to file a surreply by 8/2/2010 at 12:00pm. Surreply not to exceed 7 pages. Hearing re #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim continued to 8/4/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/30/2010. (jah)(jrl).
July 29, 2010 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #18 Objection and Request to Strike New Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff with Reply Papers or, in the Alternative, Request to File Surreply filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 7/30/2010 - Edited text (jah).
July 29, 2010 Filing 18 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Late Submission re #17 Reply to Motion to Strike Counterclaims by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 7/29/2010 - Multiple pleading filed as one. Entered using all caps. Motions to strike and to file surreply not filed. Email sent to Atty to file Motions. Corrected text (jah).
July 26, 2010 Filing 17 REPLY re #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber L. Eck, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Tarla Makaeff, #3 Table of Contents of Exhibits & Exhibit 1 to Makaeff Declaration)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 7/27/2010 - Removed duplicate docket and attachment description text (jah).
July 21, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2) by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Declaration of Michael Sexton, #4 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
July 19, 2010 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim. filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Sexton & exhibit, #2 Declaration of David K. Schneider, #3 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 7/20/2010 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
June 30, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #4 Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim, #2 Declaration of Tarla Makaeff in Support of Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim)(Eck, Amber) (kaj). Modified on 7/20/2010 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint. Defendant Trump University, LLC shall file answer to the First Amended Complaint by 7/21/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/23/2010. (jah) (jrl).
June 22, 2010 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 6/23/2010 - Corrected motion event and text (jah).
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/17/2010. (jah)(jrl).
June 16, 2010 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 6/17/2010 - Added "First" to text (jah).
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Counterclaim. Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff shall have until 6/30/2010 to file a response to the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/14/2010. (jah) (jrl).
June 9, 2010 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 6/10/2010 - Edited motion event (jah).
June 3, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula M. Roach on behalf of Tarla Makaeff (Roach, Paula). (jah).
June 3, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Jensen on behalf of Tarla Makaeff (Jensen, Rachel). (jah).
May 26, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2) by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Michael Sexton, #4 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah).
May 26, 2010 Filing 4 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Trial Demand against Tarla Makaeff, filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 5/27/2010 - Edited to add jury demand (jah).
April 30, 2010 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Amber L. Eck by Plaintiff Tarla Makaeef. (jah)
April 30, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DOES, Trump University, LLC. (jah)
April 30, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 13039.), filed by Tarla Makaeef.(mtb) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Low v. Trump University, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Oberkrom
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Murphy
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarla Makaeff
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brown
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Xavier Jay Alvarez
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Helen Irene Zeldes
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Stein
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Keller
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Low
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Xavier Jay Alvarez
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Helen Irene Zeldes
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Stein
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Everett
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Maureen E. Mueller
Represented By: Xavier Jay Alvarez
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Patrick J Coughlin
Represented By: Helen Irene Zeldes
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Stein
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Thomas R. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump University, LLC
Represented By: David Lee Kirman
Represented By: Stephen F Yunker
Represented By: Nancy L. Stagg
Represented By: Wallace Moore Allan
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Goldman
Represented By: David Keith Schneider
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Jill Ann Martin
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Trump
Represented By: David Lee Kirman
Represented By: David Keith Schneider
Represented By: Stephen F Yunker
Represented By: Nancy L. Stagg
Represented By: Wallace Moore Allan
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Goldman
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Jill Ann Martin
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump Entrepreneur Initiative
Represented By: David Lee Kirman
Represented By: Stephen F Yunker
Represented By: Nancy L. Stagg
Represented By: Wallace Moore Allan
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Goldman
Represented By: David Keith Schneider
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Jill Ann Martin
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?