Seymour v. United States Department of Defense et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Seymour
Defendant: United States Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of Homeland Security, Treasury Department, Internal Revenue, Office of the Department of National Intelligence, Attorney General, Department of State and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00983
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Revoking Plaintiff's in forma pauperis Status. Accordingly, the Court hereby CERTIFIES that Plaintiff's appeal is not in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), and REVOKES Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. Furt her requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person should be directed, on motion, to the Ninth Circuit, in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/25/2011. (USCA Case No. 11-55443. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
February 24, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying 18 Challenge to District Judge; (2) denying 16 Motion to Change Venue; (3) Dismissing Action with Prejudice; (4) denying as moot 58 80 82 99 Remaining Motions: The Court dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). This Order concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
September 29, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Construing Plaintiff's amended complaint as a motion for leave to amend; (2) Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; (3) finding as moot 33 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: the Court denies as moot Defendants' p ending motion to dismiss and vacates the hearing presently set for 10/28/10.Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint shall run from the date the Court's Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/29/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 26, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Since Plaintiff has not established her likelihood of success on the merits as required by the United State Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal, her motion for a temporary restraining order must be Denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymour v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Department of National Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?