Munoz v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Gilberto G Munoz
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Michael J Astrue, Jose Garnica, Dwight Williams and Blanca Barbosa
Case Number: 3:2010cv01003
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Following Bench Trial: For the reasons stated herein, the Court Grants Defendant's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 52(c). Plaintiff is not entitled to an y damages on his medical inquiry claim. This order, together with the 11/26/2012 Summary Judgment Order, constitute a final disposition of all claims in this action. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a) and terminate this action. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/14/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 19, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 102 Request for Appointment of Counsel. The Court finds that the circumstances here do not warrant appointing counsel to represent Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Court Denies Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
April 26, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Ex Parte Motion For Determination of Discovery Dispute. Plaintiff must supplement any responses identified herein by 5/11/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 24, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to modify the docket to reflect Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security as defendant in place of the United States of America. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/24/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 23, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; and Denying Without Prejudice 27 Request For Appointment of Counsel. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice. Defendants' Motion to Dism iss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) is granted. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, it shall be filed by 4/13/2011. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 11, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Request for Appointment of Counsel. While the Court again denies Plaintiff's request, the Court does so without prejudice. However, the Court advises Plaintiff that it will not entertain any further requests to appoint counsel until Defendants have appeared in this action at which time the Court will be able to more properly assess the merits of Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/11/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto G Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Garnica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?