Baldwin et al v. Sebelius et al

Plaintiff: Steve Baldwin and Pacific Justice Institute
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Hilda L. Solis, United States Department of Labor, Timothy F. Geithner, United States Department of the Treasury and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01033
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, vacating October 17, 2010 Order, Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application and Dismissing Case. Defendants' motion to reconsider is Granted. The Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application, filed October 17, 2010 is vacated, and Plaintiffs' ex parte application is denied. Plaintiffs' amended complaint, filed October 31, 2010, is rejected as untimely filed. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the August 27, 2010 order granting Defendants' motion to dismiss, this action is dismissed for lack of Article III standing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/31/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 27, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 22 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and (2) denying 6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Because Plaintiffs' claims fail on standing grounds, the Court declines to reach other issues raised in the briefs. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before 9/10/10. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
June 10, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/10/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin et al v. Sebelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Baldwin
Represented By: Peter Dominick Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Justice Institute
Represented By: Peter Dominick Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy F. Geithner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?