Levao v. Lewis

Petitioner: United Levao
Respondent: D T Lewis
Case Number: 3:2010cv01040
Filed: May 13, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting 48 Report and Recommendation; and (2) Denying 16 Petitioner's First Amended Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus. The district court clerk shall close the district court case file. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
January 17, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting in Full 35 Report and Recommendation; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 33 Motion For Leave to File Amended Complaint. Levao must file his second amended petition by February 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/17/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 24, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation 9 , (2) Overruling Petitioner's objections 11 , and (3) Denying Motion for Stay and Abeyance 3 . Petitioner must choose one of the following options: 1.) First Option: File a Motion for Withdrawal and Abeyance. If Petitioner chooses this option, he must file a request for withdrawal and abeyance no later than 30 days following the issuance of this order. Respondent may file a reply no later than 45 days following the issuance of this order. 2. ) Second Option: Voluntarily Dismiss the Petition. If Petitioner chooses this second option, he must file dismissal papers no later than 30 days following the issuance of this order. 3.) Third Option: Formally Abandon Unexhausted Claims. If Petitioner chooses this third option, he must file a pleading with this Court no later than 30 days following the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/23/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levao v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Levao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D T Lewis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?