Corona v. Gonzalez

Petitioner: Peter Corona
Respondent: F Gonzalez and Jerry Brown, -
Case Number: 3:2010cv01066
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 8 ) Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety, and the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 7 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment dismissing the First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 5 ) for failure to file this action within the statute of limitations set forth in 28 U.S.C. Section 2244(d). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/11/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
December 1, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Granting Respondent's Motion To Dismiss Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (Re Doc. 7 ): This Court recommends that Respondent's Motion be granted and that the Petition be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2010. Replies due by 1/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/30/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl). (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/6/2010) (mdc).
May 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ); and (2) Dismissing Case Without Prejudice And With Leave To Amend: To have this case reopened, Petitioner must, no later than 7/26/2010, file a First Amended Petition that cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/21/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 First Amended Petition form also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F Gonzalez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?