The Active Network, Inc. v. Electronic Arts, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Active Network, Inc.
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01158
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The settlement conference currently on calendar for February 4, 2011, at 9 a.m. is vacated and rescheduled to March 9, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/24/2011.(knh)
August 31, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/30/2010.(knh)
July 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation set for July 30, 2010, at 2:00 P.M. is vacated and reset for August 11, 2010 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom F before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/21/2010.(knh)
June 2, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Granting Application for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. The Court hereby orders Defendant to appear on June 28, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be entered as requested in the Application. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/1/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Active Network, Inc. v. Electronic Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Active Network, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?