Vegas Diamond Properties, LLC et al v. La Jolla Bank FSB, et al

Plaintiff: Vegas Diamond Properties, LLC and Johnson Investments, LLC
Defendant: La Jolla Bank FSB, Action Foreclosure Services, Inc. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for La Jolla Bank, FSB
Case Number: 3:2010cv01205
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Omar Benjamin Wiggins (Doc. 117 ) is granted. The claims against Defendant Wiggins are dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/18/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 28, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 97 ) Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as receiver for La Jolla Bank, is granted. The claims against Defendants La Jolla Bank, FSB, and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, are d ismissed. The (Doc. 115 ) Motion for Summary Judgment and related Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Doc. 113 ) filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as receiver for La Jolla Bank, are denied as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/28/2012. (mdc) Modified on 2/28/2012 - Notified sealed clerk re this filing. (mdc)
December 14, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 100 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Frank Warren. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/14/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
July 5, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 82 ) Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is granted. The (Doc. 81 ) Motion to Amend Answer is denied as moot. The (Doc. 92 ) Objection to Order Denying Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff is overruled. No later th en 10 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs shall file the proposed first amended complaint which is attached to the Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/5/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Atty David W. Dachelet.) (mdc) Modified on 7/5/2011 - Notified the appeals clerk re this filing. (mdc)
January 27, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 62 ) Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' request for a stay of any sale of the subject real properties pending resolution of Plaintiffs' appeal is denie d. Plaintiffs' alternative request for a thirty-day stay of the trustee's sales to afford Plaintiffs the opportunity to present a motion to stay to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals is granted. The FDIC and its agents and assignees are ord ered to refrain from selling any of the properties at issue for a period of 30 days from the date of this Order. After thirty days, this injunction shall be dissolved without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Atty David W. Dachelet.) (mdc) Modified on 1/28/2011 - Appeals clerk notified. (mdc)
October 29, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Ex Parte Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order is granted (Doc. 31 ), and the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied (Doc. 32 -1). The unopposed Motion to Renew or Continue Suit Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. Section 1821(d) is gran ted. (Doc. 39 ). The Request for Additional Briefing on the D'Oench Doctrine is denied as moot. (Doc. 51 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/29/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Attorney David W. Dachelet.) (mdc)
October 4, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 29 ) Motion to Dismiss Complaint under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike under F.R.C.P. 12(f) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to strike the request for attorney's fees and punitive damages is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/4/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Atty David W. Dachelet.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vegas Diamond Properties, LLC et al v. La Jolla Bank FSB, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vegas Diamond Properties, LLC
Represented By: Gus W Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Investments, LLC
Represented By: Gus W Flangas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Jolla Bank FSB
Represented By: Joseph Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Foreclosure Services, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Dachelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for La Jolla Bank, FSB
Represented By: Thomas E Ladegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?