Pershing Pacific West, LLC v. Ferretti Group, USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Pershing Pacific West, LLC
Defendant: Ferretti Group, USA, Inc., Marinemax, Inc. and MTU Detroit Diesel, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01345
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; Terminating as moot 99 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 101 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file Third Amended Complaint by 7/1/2013. If Plaintiff does not file its Third Amended Complaint by the aforementioned date, then Defendants may request that the Court reinstate its motions to dismiss through an ex parte application. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
April 16, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 116 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The Court HEREBY ORDERS Defendant MTUFN to provide supplemental responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production, in accordance with the terms of the Courts March 11, 2013 Discovery Order no later than May 31, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties request for a protective order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/16/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)(jrl).
March 11, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 95 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs request to compel Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's document requests. In addition, the Court HEREBY ORDERS MTUDD and MTUFN to provide supplemental responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, in accordance with the terms of this order, within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 3/11/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)(jrd)
January 24, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Ferretti and MarineMax's Motion to Dismiss Portions of the First Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND the motion to dismiss as to the causes of action for breach of contract against MarineMax and neglige nce against MarineMax; and GRANTS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND the motion to dismiss as to the causes of action for the breach of the implied warranty of merchantability, and negligence against Ferretti. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
April 9, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Compliant. Accordingly, Pershing shall file its FAC by April 16, 2012. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/3/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pershing Pacific West, LLC v. Ferretti Group, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pershing Pacific West, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferretti Group, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Lenore Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinemax, Inc.
Represented By: Edward M Cramp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTU Detroit Diesel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?