Aho v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stephen D. Aho
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01373
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel depositions and written discovery. Defendant is ordered to respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production Nos. 1-3 and 5-8 by March 29, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/19/12. (lao)
January 31, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on his declaratory relief and 17200 claims is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/31/12. (lao)
November 8, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will issue a second amended order on the motion for class certification that is consistent with this ruling. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/8/11. (lao)
July 25, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel; (2) denying as moot 41 Motion to Exclude Putative Class Members with Arbitration Clauses. The attorneys of record for named class Plaintiff are designated as counsel for this class. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with certification of subclass, he shall file a supplemental brief by 08/01/11. Defendant shall file a responsive brief by 08/08/11. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 07/25/11. (cge)
June 8, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Specifically, the Court denies the motion as to the issues of standing and the statutes of limitation, but grants the motion as to preemption. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/8/11. (lao)
November 18, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, alternatively, stay this case. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/18/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aho v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen D. Aho
Represented By: Michael E Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?