Borja v. Gonzalez et al

Plaintiff: Jose A Borja
Defendant: F Gonzalez, J Gonzalez, M Alvarez, C Neal and Deleat
Case Number: 3:2010cv01379
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/16/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
November 14, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 39 Motion for Court-Appointed Expert without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/14/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
July 5, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and dismisses Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment Equal Protection Claim. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 07/01/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
January 21, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 18 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and Granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim for money damages against Defendants in their official capacity is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 23, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 9/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 9, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no initial partial filing fee and garnishing balance from Prisoner's trust account pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to effect ser vice of Complaint pursuant to FED.R.Civ.P.4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/8/10. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR) (pro per package mailed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borja v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Borja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deleat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?