Fernandez et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Fernando Fernandez, Maria Fernandez and JRGF
Defendant: United States of America, Alexandro Gaitan, Unknown Agents of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection, DOES 1 through 50 and John Carrol
Case Number: 3:2010cv01387
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 33 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have thirty (30) days to submit an amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/23/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
January 4, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ms. Guizar is relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. A new attorney must be found for JRGF if JRGF wishes to proceed with his claims. The new attorney must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/4/11. (jer)
July 15, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Petition and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. A Status Hearing as to continuance of the appointment shall take place on January 12, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/14/10.(vet) Modified on 7/15/2010 - Edited text (vet).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Fernandez
Represented By: Monica T Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fernandez
Represented By: Monica T Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRGF
Represented By: Monica T Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandro Gaitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Agents of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?