Caravantes v. California Reconveyance Company et al

Plaintiff: David Caravantes
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company, Washington Mutual Bank, FA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Home Finance LLC, Vrej Joukadarian, Clement J. Durkin, Deborah Brignac, Ann Thorn and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01407
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss. The Court Denies Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs cause of action for violation of California Civil Code § 2923.5; and Grants in part and Denies in part Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs cause of action for violation of the UCL. Because Plaintiffs remaining UCL claims are his only claims asserted against Defendants Brignac and Thorn, the Court Dismisses with Prejudice Defendants Brignac and Thorn. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/22/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
August 3, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Deborah Bringnac, California Reconveyance Company, Chase Home Finance LLC, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, and Washington Mutual Bank, FA's 20 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Pla's 2nd and 5th causes of action are dismissed w/o prejudice. Pla's 4th cause of action is dismissed w/ prejudice. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 14, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The following causes of action are dismissed w/ prejudice: 1.) 1st, 3rd, 15th and 16th causes of action as to Dft JPMorgan, 2.) 2nd cause o f action as to Dft JPMorgan, 3.) 4th, 5th, and 6th causes of action as to all moving Dfts. The following causes of action are dismissed with leave to amend: 1.) the 2nd cause of action for violation of RESPA as to all moving Dfts, 2.) 7th and 8th cau ses of action for civil conspiracy and unfair business practices, 3.) 9th, 10th, 11th and 12th causes of action for violations of RICO, and 4.) 14th cause of action for violations of Cal. Civ. Code 2923.54. Motion to Dismiss is denied as to the 13th cause of action for violation of Cal. Civ. Code 2923.5. If Pla wishes to file an amended complaint, he should do so w/in 21 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
July 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot (Doc. 2 ) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/6/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caravantes v. California Reconveyance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Caravantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vrej Joukadarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement J. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Brignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?