Vera v. O'Keefe III et al

Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Vera
Defendant: James O'Keefe III, Hanna Giles and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01422
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's Motion 80 Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting Pretrial Conference Dates. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/9/2012. (sjt)
March 16, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order. The depositions scheduled for March 19, 2012, will proceed absent an Order to the contrary by the District Judge. The lodging of an objection to this Order will not stay the scheduled depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/16/2012. (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 15, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 46 Objections; and Overruling O'Keefe's 44 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Orders. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/15/2012.(mtb)
September 23, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 42 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/23/2011. (Dembin, Mitchell)
May 23, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. O'Keefe III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Vera
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Keefe III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?