McKenzie v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Gustavo McKenzie
Defendant: G Ellis, John Mitchell, M Vorise, W Tietz, D Bell, T Ochoa and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01490
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation; (2) Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendations; (3) Adopting Report and Recommendation as Modified; (4) Dismissing Federal Claims without leave to amend; and Order of Remand. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/12/12. (certified copy sent to Superior Court, County of Imperial)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
January 6, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 42 Motion for Disqualification or Recusal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/5/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
September 30, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Dismissing Complaint; the Court overrules plaintiff's objections, and adopts the Report and Recommendation; the motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part; the entire complaint is dismissed without prejudice; no later than November 15, 2011, plaintiff may file an amended complaint; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/29/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Ellis
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mitchell
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vorise
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Tietz
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Bell
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?