Thornton v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: William Cecil Thornton
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Matthew Cate, Lewis, Mark Joseph, Christine Cavalin and John Doe #1
Case Number: 3:2010cv01583
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Because Plaintiff's claims are not cognizable under § 1983, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is Granted. Thornton's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice so that he may bring his claims in a properly filed habeas petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/1/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 11, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 28 Second Request for Appointment of Counsel or, Alternatively, Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/11/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 4, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/4/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
August 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing US Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3)& 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cecil Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Cavalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?