Sanchez v. Sanchez et al

Plaintiff: Albert Sanchez, Sr.
Defendant: Albert Sanchez, Jr., Garnett McKeen, Laboratory, Inc., El-Gen LLC, AMARC, Enterprises, Inc., Alo Investments, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01628
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) DISMISSING With Prejudice All Causes of Action; (2) Vacating Hearing. The hearing set for August 28, 2015, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/27/2015. (srm)
August 13, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 145 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. As provided herein, the motion by counsel for Plaintiff to withdraw is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/13/15. (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 21, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE: This case is STAYED pending issuance of a final judgment in the parallel state-court action. The parties shall NOTIFY the Court of entry of final judgment in the parallel state-court action within two weeks of such judgment being entered. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/21/2012. (mdc)
May 12, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; (2) denying 34 Motion for TRO: Plaintiff's first and fifth causes of action are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint for the limited purpose incorporating the factual allegations of the fifth cause of action into the sixth cause of action within 7 days of this Order being electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/12/11. (lmt)
November 17, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for TRO and/or an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Entered. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/17/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Sanchez, Sr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Mirch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Sanchez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnett McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El-Gen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMARC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alo Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?