Hamana v. Kholi et al

Plaintiff: Arkan Hamana
Defendant: Sam Kholi, Sam Kholi Enterprises, Inc., Laverne Kato, Andy Hallak and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01630
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motions to Dismiss and Strike. Defendants 40 motion to dismiss is Granted in part and Denied in part. Plaintiff's 50 motion to file a sur-reply is Denied. Plaintiff's 43 motion to strike is Denied. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/24/11. (ecs)
March 15, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Motions to Dismiss and Amend [Docket Nos 6,9,18]. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss certain claims is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted as to Plaintiff's RICO cause of action and denied as to Plaintiff's se ction 17200 claims. Defendant Kholi's motion to strike is granted. Plaintiff has leave to amend the complaint to cure the deficiencies in his second cause of action. This amended complaint must be filed within twenty days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/15/2011. (jer)
August 19, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for a TRO. The Court OVERRULES Defendants' evidentiary objections as moot. Plaintiff has also asked for an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. The Court issues the following shortened briefing schedule on the preliminary injunction; Plaintiff's brief is due September 3, 2010. Defendants' opposition is due September 13, 2010. And Plaintiff's reply is due September 16, 2010. The Court will issue a separate order setting a hearing date shortly thereafter. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/19/2010. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamana v. Kholi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkan Hamana
Represented By: Steven Anmar Elia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kholi
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Sikkema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kholi Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Sikkema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laverne Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hallak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?