Hamana v. Kholi et al
Plaintiff: |
Arkan Hamana |
Defendant: |
Sam Kholi, Sam Kholi Enterprises, Inc., Laverne Kato, Andy Hallak and DOES |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv01630 |
Filed: |
August 5, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Presiding Judge: |
Bernard G. Skomal |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 25, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER re Motions to Dismiss and Strike. Defendants 40 motion to dismiss is Granted in part and Denied in part. Plaintiff's 50 motion to file a sur-reply is Denied. Plaintiff's 43 motion to strike is Denied. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/24/11. (ecs)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER Re Motions to Dismiss and Amend [Docket Nos 6,9,18]. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss certain claims is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted as to Plaintiff's RICO cause of action and denied as to Plaintiff's se ction 17200 claims. Defendant Kholi's motion to strike is granted. Plaintiff has leave to amend the complaint to cure the deficiencies in his second cause of action. This amended complaint must be filed within twenty days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/15/2011. (jer)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for a TRO. The Court OVERRULES Defendants' evidentiary objections as moot. Plaintiff has also asked for an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. The Court issues the following shortened briefing schedule on the preliminary injunction; Plaintiff's brief is due September 3, 2010. Defendants' opposition is due September 13, 2010. And Plaintiff's reply is due September 16, 2010. The Court will issue a separate order setting a hearing date shortly thereafter. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/19/2010. (jer)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?