Navarro v. Greenlight Financial Services et al

Plaintiff: Graciela Ruiz De Navarro
Defendant: Greenlight Financial Services, Erica Lizarraga, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Chicago Title Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01631
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Based on the foregoing information stated herein, the Court grants Defendant's Motion and Dismisses this action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/24/2011.(Copy sent to Plaintiffs' counsel and Plaintiffs at most current address listed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 19, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motions to Dismiss re: 13 , 14 . However, in light of Plaintiffs' counsel's deficient representation, final dismissal at this time is premature. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants' mot ions to dismiss and Dismisses Without Prejudice Plaintiffs first amended complaint. Within 30 days from the date of this order, if Plaintiffs wish to continue litigating this case they must either: a) file a notice of substitution of counsel naming a new new attorney, or b) file a notice of their intent to represent themselves and to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/19/2010. (cc: Plaintiffs' counsel, Plaintiffs) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 2, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Docs. 5 , 7 ). It is hereby ordered that Defendants Greenlight Financial Services and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss are Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/2/2010. (leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Greenlight Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Ruiz De Navarro
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlight Financial Services
Represented By: Gina L. Albertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?