Mallen v. Alphatec Holdings, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Mallen
Defendant: Alphatec Holdings, Inc, Dirk Kuyper, Peter C. Wulff, Mortimer Berkowitz, III, Healthpoint Capital Partners, LLP and Healthpoint Capital Partners II, LLP
Case Number: 3:2010cv01673
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 74 , 75 , 76 ). The Court's dismissal is with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/28/2013.(knb)
March 22, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting the Healthpoint Defendants', the Underwriter Defendants', and the Alphatec Defendants' Motions to Dismiss with Leave to Amend (Doc. Nos. 41 , 42 , 44 ). Plaintiffs are granted 28 days from the filing of this Order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/21/2012. (knb)
January 19, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Unopposed Motion to Appoint FCERA as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel. The Court approves FCERA's selection of Cohen Milstein as lead counsel and Glancy Binkow as liaison counsel. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/18/2011. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallen v. Alphatec Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Mallen
Represented By: David N Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphatec Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kuyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter C. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer Berkowitz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthpoint Capital Partners, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthpoint Capital Partners II, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?