Jackson v. State of California

Petitioner: Richard Edward Jackson, III
Respondent: State of California
Case Number: 3:2010cv01696
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Second Amended Petition is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a cognizable claim for habeas corpus relief and failure to name a proper respondent. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this habeas action, Petitioner must, no l ater than 2/25/2011, file a Third Amended Petition which cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. If Petitioner's Third Amended Petition does not cure the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order, Petitioner is advised that th e Court will dismiss his petition without prejudice but without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/11/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Third Amended Petition also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)
September 30, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting In Forma Pauperis Application; (2) Dismissing First Amended Petition Without Prejudice; And (3) Denying Motion To Be Released To Federal Custody: Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/30/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 form mailed with this Order.) (mdc)
August 24, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and with leave to Amend. If Petitioner wishes to challenge the validity of a state court conviction or the length of his incarceration via a habeas corpus petition, he must submit, no later than October 25, 201 0: (1) a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee; and (2) a First Amended Petition which cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. If Petitioner wishes challenge the conditions o f his confinement, he must file a new civil complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 which will be given a new civil case number. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/23/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(copy of Order, IFP form, First Amended 2254 form, and 1983 Complaint form mailed to Plaintiff)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Edward Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?