Owen v. Busby et al

Petitioner: Chester W Owen, Jr
Respondent: Timothy Busby and Director of California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2010cv01734
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/29/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 2, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court also concludes that Petitioner fails to make a substantial showing of the denialof a constitutional right. Accordingly, any request for a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/2/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
October 28, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Petitioner's request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/28/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chester W Owen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Busby
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?