Edwards v. Wachovia Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: Greg Edwards
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, World Savings Bank, FSB, Irvine Funding Corporation, Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01763
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 26 ) Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., World Savings Bank, FSB and Wachovia Mortgage is granted. Plaintiff's counsel Nicole Gallagher's (Doc. 36 ) Motion to Withdraw is granted. No later than 15 days from the date of this Order, Nicole Gallagher shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Greg Edwards and file a proof of service including his last known addresses. No later than 90 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a motion for substitution pursuant to Local Rule 83.3, requesting an order of substitution and indicating whether Plaintiff will represent himself in this action, or appoint a new attorney to represent him in this action. If no motion for substitution is filed within 90 days from the date of this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/4/2011. (mdc)
May 26, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 31 ) Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Re: a Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/26/2011. (mdc)
February 10, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 6 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Wells Fargo are dismissed. Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/10/2011. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Wachovia Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Edwards
Represented By: Kent C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvine Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?