Cardenas et al v. Whittemore et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Cardenas, Machelle Cardenas and El Paseo Grande, LLC
Defendant: Robertson Whittemore and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01808
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; and ORDER OF JUDGMENT: In light of the determinations of fact and conclusions of law, the Court finds for Plaintiffs on both the claim for declaratory relief, and the claim for trespass. The Court Awards Plai ntiffs $1.00 in nominal damages for trespass, against Mr. Whittemore individually. The request for injunctive relief is Denied as unnecessary. The Court Orders as Moot the Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants, and to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/8/2013.(leh)
February 8, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Unopposed Motion in Limine to exclude testimony of David Van Atta. The motion in limine is granted and the testimony it describes is Ordered excluded. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/8/13. (lao)
January 22, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 92 Motion for additional discovery, for leave to amend, and for leave to move for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/18/13. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas et al v. Whittemore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cardenas
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle Cardenas
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Paseo Grande, LLC
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?