Liberty Media Holdings, LLC v. March et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings, LLC
Defendant: James March, Perry Sjogren, DI S.A., Corbinfisheraw.com, Above.com Domain Privacy, Domains by Proxy, Inc, Privacyprotect.org, Adrush Media, Nameview, Inc, Myclickto.com, Who is Protector, Inc, Direct Privacy ID 826C9, Who is Privacy Protection Services, Inc and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01809
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Application for Limited Temporary Restraining Order Freezing Domain Name Portfolios of Defendants in Default, Ryoichi Watanabe, Jason Phillips, David Smith, and Adrush Media submitted by Plaintiff Liberty Media Holdings, LLC is DENIED. The Motion for Order Temporarily Sealing Portions of the File submitted by Plaintiff Liberty Media Holdings, LLC is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Application for Limited Temporary Restraining Order Freezing Domain Name Portfolios and the Motion for Order Temporarily Sealing Portions of the File. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/3/2012. (mdc)(jrd)
November 22, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion For Early Discovery (Re Doc. 50 ): Plaintiff may serve subpoenas, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, on Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutions, and the Planet.com Internet Services, Inc. that seek the name, address, credit card billing address, and email address of Defendant March, as well as all IP address login information for the accounts held at Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutions, and the Planet.com Internet Services, Inc. Plaintiff also may serve subpoenas seeking the name, address, credit card billing address, and email address of Defendant March on any appropriate ISP for any IP address(es) identified as being used by James March. Plaintiff's request to c onduct additional discovery, including serving interrogatories or deposing individuals, is denied as Plaintiff has not made the requisite showing for such discovery nor has it adequately described the specific discovery to be conducted. Within seven (7) calendar days after service of the subpoenas, Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutions, the Planet.com Internet Services, Inc., and/or any other ISPs that are identified through the discovered IP addresses, shall notify the subscribers that thei r identities are sought by Plaintiff. Each subscriber whose identity is sought may, within twenty-one (21) calendar days from the date of such notice, file documents with the Court that contest the subpoena. If Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutio ns, and/or the Planet.com Internet Services, Inc. wish to move to quash the subpoena issued to them, they shall do so before the return date of the subpoena. If such a motion is brought, Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutions, and/or the Planet.co m Internet Services, Inc. shall preserve the information sought by Plaintiff in the subpoena pending resolution of such motion. Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this Order to Enom, Inc., Strobe.org, Network Solutions, and the Planet.com Internet Services, Inc. when the subpoenas are served on each of them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/22/2011. (mdc)(jrd)
April 13, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Limited Temporary Restraining Order; denying as moot 44 Motion for Order Temporarily Sealing Portions of the File. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/13/11.(rlu) Per chambers request, filed Order prior to motions(rlu).
January 20, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 15 ) Second Motion for Alternate Service is granted. Plaintiff may effectuate service by delivering the summons and Complaint to Defendants Ryoichi Watanabe, Jason Phillips, David Smith, and Adrush Media's last known valid email address. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/19/2011. (mdc)
December 20, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 9 ) Motion for Alternate Service is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/20/2010. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Media Holdings, LLC v. March et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Sjogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DI S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbinfisheraw.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Above.com Domain Privacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains by Proxy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privacyprotect.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrush Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nameview, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myclickto.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Who is Protector, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Privacy ID 826C9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Who is Privacy Protection Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?