Porter v. Howard et al

Plaintiff: Samuel K Porter
Defendant: Muabe Howard, Hernandez, Unknown, and CDCR/IA
Case Number: 3:2010cv01817
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Court approves and adopts 192 Report and Recommendation in its entirety and grants Defendants' 150 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/29/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 10, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Court adopts 106 Report and Recommendation in full. Granting Dfts' 76 Motion to Dismiss. Because Court agrees w/ the Report and Recommendation's findings that "allegation of other facts c onsistent w/ the challenged pleading could not possibly cure the deficiency", namely Pla's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies, Court dismisses w/ prejudice the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/10/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 27, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying 80 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; (2) granting 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and Setting Briefing Schedule as 76 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss; (3)denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance; and denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay: Plaintiff must file his Opposition on or before 12/12/11. Defendants must file any reply by 12/19/11. The hearing date of 11/8/11 is VACATED. The matter will be submitted on 12/27/11 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 10/27/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
July 29, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendants' 27 motion to strike is DENIED, Defendants' 27 motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any amended complaint SHALL BE FILED within 31 days of the day this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/29/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
June 20, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's 2nd Motion Ex Parte for Inadequate Access to the Courts and Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate's Submitting the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 6/20/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)(jrd)
May 5, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 , 20 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/5/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)(jrd)
February 23, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) submitting 27 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike First Amended Complaint; (2) denying as moot 37 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Prepare Response; and (3) denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Access to the Courts: The Motion to Dismiss is submitted on the papers and the hearing date of 2/25/11 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 2/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel K Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muabe Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR/IA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?