-WMC Castillo v. John Skoba et al

Defendant: John Skoba, Margaret Padilla, R.K. Arnold and John Doe
Intervenor_plaintiff: Paul R Castillo
Case Number: 3:2010cv01838
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 19 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Federal RICO claim is dismissed without leave to amend. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's remaining state claims. These claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
January 7, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion for Relief from Order Lifting Injunction on Foreclosure Sale. The injunction enjoining foreclosure sale of the Plaintiff's home remains vacated. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/7/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer) Modified on 1/10/2011 to correct file date (jer). (jrl).
October 21, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Waiver of Security Payments. In light of the fact that Plaintiff's motion to waive the security deposit was received on October 14, 2010, the Court hereby revises its October 8 Order to allow first payment of Plaintiff's bond to be made on October 25, 2010. All other language in this Order is unchanged. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/21/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 8 Second Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued. It is ORDERED that Defendants and Defendants' officers, agents, employees, and those acting with knowledge of this Order be enjoined from selling the property known as 1924 Rees Road in San Marcos, California at foreclosure sale. This injunction shall remain in effect as long as Plaintiff posts monthly security payments in the regist ry of the Court. Defendants' failure to comply with this Order shall be treated as a contempt of court. Plaintiff shall forthwith provide notice of this order by serving all Defendants. Defendants are ordered to show cause, no later than October 22, 2010, why a preliminary injunction should not restrain sale until termination of this case. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
September 7, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO: Plaintiff has failed to show he is likely to succeed on the merits and the Court denies his motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/7/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -WMC Castillo v. John Skoba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Paul R Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Skoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.K. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?