Villa et al v. Hellar et al

Plaintiff: William Villa, Villa Realty, Inc., Patricia Villa and Acclaim Financial Services Inc.
Defendant: Gretchen Hellar, William Hellar, Diane Hellar, Hellar Charitable Remainder Trust, Collin Cook, American Contractors Indemnity Company, DOES, Stephanie Ruiz and Michael Lusby
Case Number: 3:2010cv01885
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 110 Motion to Vacate the Substitution of Michael Lusby as a Party Defendant. Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal or Application for Default Judgment due 2/25/13. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/28/13. (cge)
November 27, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Substitute Party Defendant Michael Lusby (deceased). Michael Lusby, son of deceased Defendant Michael Lusby should be substituted as a party Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/27/12. (cge)(jrd)
August 7, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant William Hellar's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant William Hellar's 80 Motion for Sanctions; granting both parties' request for judicial notice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/3/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
June 7, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Moving Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss; Sua Sponte Dismissing Certain Claims Against Defendants Michael Lusby, Gretchen Hellar, William Hellar; and Diane Hellar, Hellar Charitable Remainder Trust; denying Moving Defendants' ; 31 Motion for Sanctions; granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 06/07/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (Main Document 52 replaced on 6/7/2011 to remove blank last page) (cge).
September 10, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Ex Parte Motion for TRO. Because Plaintiff has not identified to the Court's satisfaction the basis for asking the Court to forego notice to Defendant prior to granting injunctive relief, the Plaintiff's motion for a TRO is Denied. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villa et al v. Hellar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villa Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acclaim Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Hellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hellar
Represented By: Daniel W Ballesteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Hellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hellar Charitable Remainder Trust
Represented By: Daniel W Ballesteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Cook
Represented By: Raul Luis Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: Raul Luis Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Represented By: Raul Luis Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?