Banks v. ACS Education et al

Plaintiff: Alfred Banks
Defendant: ACS Education, Coast Professional Inc., State Student Aid Comm., JP Morgan, Experian, Equifax, Trans Union, California Student Aid Comm, California Student Comm., National University, ACS College Loan Corp., Procollect Inc, Union Workers CS, First Bank of Delaware, Jefferson Capital Systet and Tribute Cotinental Finance/1st Banks De
Case Number: 3:2010cv01886
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint With Prejudice (Docs. 302 , 321 , 323 , 324 , 334 , 337 , and 339 ); Denying As Moot 340 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The Court Grants Defendants' motions to dismiss with prejudice. The Clerk of this Court shall enter judgment against Plaintiff and terminate the case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
July 25, 2012 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 293 Request for Recusal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/25/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
March 26, 2012 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 96 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 98 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 102 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 103 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 115 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 119 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 121 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Granting in Part and Denying as Moot in Part 194 Ex Parte Application Request for extension of time to serve defendant; Granting 201 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 203 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 204 Motion to Strike ; Gr anting 227 Motion to Compel; Granting 234 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 240 Motion to Quash; Denying 256 Motion for Default Judgment. The Plaintiff must file his Third Amended Complaint by April 27, 2012, and it must remove those Defendants that have been dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 25, 2011 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Submitted Motions [Doc. Nos. 96, 98, 102, 103, 115, 119, 121] as Motions Responsive to the Second Amended Complaint and denying 106 Motion for Reconsideration re 179 Second Amended Complaint filed by Alfred Banks. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 08/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 13, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 Motion to Quash; dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint as to Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC; and denying 175 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 07/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 6, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery 124 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 04/06/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
March 2, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Motions to Set Aside Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment. Defendants JPMorgan's and Kathleen Barnhill's motions to set aside default [docks. # 44, 50] are granted. Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Default Judgment ag ainst Defendants is denied. Plaintiff shall effect proper service on Defendants JPMorgan, Kathleen Barnhill, "Charlette", State Student Aid Commission, and any other Defendant within sixty days of the filing of this order or his case against any Defendant not properly served shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/2/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to File. Having reviewed Plaintiff's proposed Complaint in this case, the Court concludes the claims asserted therein do not fall within the scope of the pre-filing order. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/21/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. ACS Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Student Aid Comm.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Student Aid Comm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Student Comm.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS College Loan Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procollect Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Workers CS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribute Cotinental Finance/1st Banks De
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?