Beall v. Quality Loan Service Corp et al

Plaintiff: Diane Beall
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp, Onewest Bank, F.S.B. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01900
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 37 Quality Loan's Ex Parte Motion Excusing Quality from Further Participation; granting 42 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; denying 46 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply because of Stricken Document. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 07/15/11. (cge) (Main Document 50 replaced on 7/15/2011) (cge).
March 21, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant OneWest Bank's 16 Motion to Dismiss. Granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gary L. Harre is substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff Dianne Beall in place of Attorney Diane Beall terminated. Court orders that Pla's claims for Wrongful Foreclosure, violations of the Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act's disclosure requirements under 12 USC 2605(a), Rescission, violations of the Truth in Lending Act's requireme nts under 15 USC 1635(a), Injunctive Relief, and Accounting are dismissed with prejudice. Pla's claims to Quiet Title, for violations of the Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act's requirements under 15 USC 2605 and 2607, Fraud, violations o f California Unfair Competition Law, and violations in the Truth in Lending Act's requirements under 16 USC 1641(g)(1) are dismissed without prejudice. Pla may file an Amended Complaint w/in 20 calendar days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/21/2011. (jah)
September 16, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 3 Motion for TRO. The hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction set for 10/18/2010 is vacated. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/16/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beall v. Quality Loan Service Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Beall
Represented By: Diane Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?