Vera v. Adams et al

Petitioner: Guillermo Vera
Respondent: Darril Adams and K Alison
Case Number: 3:2010cv01940
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 62 Motion to Vacate. Having read and made its best attempt to consider Vera's opposition to the R&R, the Court's ruling stands. The R&R is adopted, and Respondent's motion to dismiss is granted. The Court will continue to deny Vera a certificate of appealability.This case is closed, and the Court will not accept any further pleadings from Vera. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/27/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
September 3, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 47 in its entirety. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 19 is granted. Petitioner's motions to amend the findings and for a preliminary injunction and TRO are denied. Petitioner's motions for more time to oppose the R&R are denied. The Court also denies Vera a certificate of appealability. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/3/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 39 Motion to Amend the Findings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/24/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
December 27, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/27/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
August 10, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Sua Sponte Substitution Respondent. Matthew Cate, Secretary is substituted as Respondent in place of Kathy Alison. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/9/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
September 21, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Request for Extension of Time; Petitioner's request to toll the statute of limitations is denied without prejudice; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/20/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Guillermo Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darril Adams
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K Alison
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?